EP1932679 - An article with micro indicia security enhancement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JDS Uniphase Corporation 430 N. McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2008/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Argoita, Alberto 1628 Tahoe Drive Santa Rosa 95405 California / US | 02 /
Teitelbaum, Neil 834 Colonel By Drive Ottawa Ontario K1S5C4 / CA | [2008/25] | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/25] | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07024313.4 | 14.12.2007 | [2008/25] | Priority number, date | US20060875041P | 15.12.2006 Original published format: US 875041 P | [2008/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1932679 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/00, B42D15/10 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
B42D25/00 (EP,US);
B41M1/18 (KR);
B42D25/324 (US);
B42D15/00 (KR);
B42D25/29 (EP,US);
C09J11/02 (EP,US);
D21H21/40 (EP,US);
G03H1/0011 (EP,US);
B42D2033/20 (EP);
B42D2035/24 (EP);
B42D2035/44 (EP);
B42D2035/50 (EP);
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
D21H21/44 (EP,US);
D21H21/48 (EP,US);
G02B5/285 (EP,US);
G03H1/0244 (EP,US);
G03H1/26 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0016 (EP,US);
G03H2001/188 (EP,US);
G03H2210/55 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/25] | Title | German: | Artikel mit erhöhter Sicherheit durch Mikromarkierung | [2008/25] | English: | An article with micro indicia security enhancement | [2008/25] | French: | Article avec une amélioration de la sécurité des micro-indices | [2008/25] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/29] | 05.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2004151827 (ARGOITIA ALBERTO [US], et al) [AD] 1-15* paragraphs [0005] , [0011] , [0034]; claim 1 * | by applicant | US5135812 | US5314767 | US6616190 | US6692830 | US6749777 | US6749936 | US6815065 | US6841238 | US6902807 | US6987590 | US2006077496 | US7081819 | US2006285184 | US2007058227 | US7224528 | US7241489 | US7258915 | US2007195392 | US2007206249 | US20060875041 |