04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
14.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
01.03.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |
01.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
05.10.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
27.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
13.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
08.06.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
18.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
11.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
04.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
21.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
13.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] |
28.10.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
26.10.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.10.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.09.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.07.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] |
22.07.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] |
15.02.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.12.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.10.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.10.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] |
15.06.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.03.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.01.2010 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |
18.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.12.2009 |
First examination report |
|
27.11.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.07.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
15.05.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] |
03.04.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|