EP2071688 - Cable duct through a building wall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauff-Technik GmbH & Co. KG In den Stegwiesen 18 89542 Herbrechtingen / DE | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheuring, Horst Narzissenweg 18 89182 Bernstadt / DE | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Szynka, Dirk, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zielstattstraße 38 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Szynka, Dirk, et al König, Szynka, Tilmann, von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Sollner Strasse 9 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/25] | Szynka, Dirk, et al König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Sollner Strasse 9 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07024323.3 | 14.12.2007 | [2009/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2071688 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2071688 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16L5/02, H02G3/22 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
H02G3/22 (EP);
F16L5/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/25] | H02G3/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | Leitungsdurchführung durch eine Gebäudewand | [2009/25] | English: | Cable duct through a building wall | [2009/25] | French: | Passage de câbles à travers un mur de bâtiment | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 02.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10010530.3 / EP2270942 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.11.2011 | DK | 30.11.2011 | EE | 30.11.2011 | FI | 30.11.2011 | HU | 30.11.2011 | IE | 30.11.2011 | LT | 30.11.2011 | LV | 30.11.2011 | MT | 30.11.2011 | RO | 30.11.2011 | SE | 30.11.2011 | SI | 30.11.2011 | SK | 30.11.2011 | TR | 30.11.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | BG | 29.02.2012 | GB | 29.02.2012 | GR | 01.03.2012 | ES | 11.03.2012 | IS | 30.03.2012 | PT | 30.03.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GB | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GB | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GB | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GB | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GB | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 30.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3623547 (STEWING NACHRICHTENTECHNIK) [Y] 13,14,19-21 * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 6; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0681134 (HAUFF WERNER [DE]) [Y] 3,4,9 * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 50; figure 1 *; | [XY]JPH0819143 (YAZAKI CORP) [X] 1,2,5-8,10-12,15-18,21,23,24 * abstract * [Y] 13,14,19-21,3,4,9; | [A]EP1101993 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1-24* paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-3 * |