Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP1944040

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 IE 
 IT 
 LI 
 LU 
 MC 
 NL 
 PT 
 SE 
 SK 
 TR 
Examination procedure30.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
07.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
07.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
European patent granted01.08.2012
Opposition procedure03.05.2013No opposition filed within time limit published on 10.07.2013 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:16.07.2008 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20080107
 
Event date:16.07.2008 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:1416965
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:16.07.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR
 
Event date:24.12.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 39/395 20060101AFI20080602BHEP
 
Event date:24.12.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 38/00 20060101ALI20081118BHEP
 
Event date:24.12.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 33/53 20060101ALI20081118BHEP
 
Event date:24.12.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 33/567 20060101ALI20081118BHEP
 
Event date:24.12.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 33/566 20060101ALI20081118BHEP
 
Event date:24.12.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C07K 16/00 20060101ALI20081118BHEP
 
Event date:24.12.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR
 
Event date:02.09.2009 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20090731
 
Event date:02.09.2009 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR
 
Event date:25.01.2012 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C07K 16/18 20060101AFI20111220BHEP
 
Event date:25.01.2012 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 33/68 20060101ALI20111220BHEP
 
Event date:01.08.2012 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR
 
Event date:01.08.2012 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:1416965
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:01.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
REPRESENTATIVE:FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI
 
Event date:29.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:27.09.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 60243450 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20120927
 
Event date:16.10.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:29.10.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:31.10.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20121022
 
Event date:28.11.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:03.12.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T3 E 12454 SK
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK
 
Event date:17.12.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE FG4A E007204 EE
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA
Effective DATE:20121025
 
Event date:30.11.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2391905 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20121130
 
Event date:10.07.2013 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20130503
 
Event date:20.12.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R079 60243450 DE
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS
Free Format Text:PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A61K0039395000
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C07K0016180000
 
Event date:29.08.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 60243450 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
Effective DATE:20130503
 
Event date:15.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 568661 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA)
Effective DATE:20120815
 
Event date:23.01.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20120402468 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20121122
 
Event date:19.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:20.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:18.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20190619
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20190729
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20190716
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20190726
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20190726
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20190726
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Payment DATE:20190731
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20190729
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20190725
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20190808
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20190726
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:29.11.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Payment DATE:20190710
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.12.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20190726
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:15.03.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE MM4A E007204 EE
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BY NOT PAYING THE ANNUAL FEES
Effective DATE:20200831
 
Event date:30.03.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:31.03.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20200831
 
Event date:29.03.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EBP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT LAPSED
Effective DATE:20200831
 
Event date:15.04.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MM01 568661 AT T
Code Expl.:-LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES
Effective DATE:20200816
 
Event date:28.04.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK MM4A E 12454 SK
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE FEES
Effective DATE:20200816
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20200816
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20200831
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20200816
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20200816
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20210317
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20200816
 
Event date:24.03.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FI MAE
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT EXPIRED
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20200816
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20210228
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20200817
 
Event date:30.06.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20200816
 
Event date:29.06.2012 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:08.05.2012 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:17.01.2012 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:21.11.2008 
Event description:SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013
 
Event date:13.06.2008 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:07.06.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:31.08.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20200816
 
Event date:31.08.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20200831
 
Event date:31.08.2021 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20210720
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.10.2021 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20210722
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.10.2021 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20210720
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2021 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20210722
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2021 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20210730
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2021 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20210720
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2021 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20210722
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2021 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20210720
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2021 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20210901
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2021 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20210720
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:07.06.2013 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261
 
Event date:16.08.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 60243450 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:17.08.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20220815
 
Event date:31.08.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:02.09.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20220902
 
Event date:07.09.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20220815
 
Event date:27.09.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20220816
 
Event date:31.10.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20220817
 
Event date:31.10.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20220815