EP1935592 - Device for cutting food with ultrasound and ultrasonically activated cutting tools [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Wolf & Partner GmbH Ingenieurbüro für Lebensmitteltechnik Martha-Brautzsch-Strasse 8 06108 Halle/Saale / DE | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Karlheinz, Dr. Am Park 2 OT Sennewitz 06193 Götschetal / DE | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Holland, Ralf Eikel & Partner GbR Anwaltskanzlei Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 107 32760 Detmold / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Holland, Ralf Eikel & Partner GbR Anwaltskanzlei Hünenweg 15 32760 Detmold / DE | ||
Former [2008/26] | Leinung, Günter Patentanwalt, Olvenstedter Strasse 15 39108 Magdeburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07024354.8 | 15.12.2007 | [2008/26] | Priority number, date | DE20061059940 | 19.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006059940 | [2008/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1935592 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/08, // B26D1/00, B26D7/06, B26D7/26, B26D11/00, B26D5/02 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
B26D7/086 (EP);
B26D1/0006 (EP);
B26D11/00 (EP);
B26D5/02 (EP);
B26D7/0625 (EP);
B26D7/2614 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Schneiden von Lebensmitteln mit Ultraschall und ultraschallerregte Schneidwerkzeuge | [2008/26] | English: | Device for cutting food with ultrasound and ultrasonically activated cutting tools | [2008/26] | French: | Dispositif de coupe de produits alimentaires par ultrason et outils de coupe à ultrasons | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 07.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/52] | 08.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US3086288 (LEWIS BALAMUTH, et al) [Y] 5 * figures 4-6 * [A] 1-4; | [A]GB2219245 (RAWSON FRANCIS F H, et al) [A] 1-5 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0540496 (GFM FERTIGUNGSTECHNIK [AT]) [A] 1-5* abstract *; | [YA]DE4310832 (ROWENTA WERKE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * the whole document * [A] 1-3; | [XY]WO9933356 (MARS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [Y] 5; | [XY]FR2882677 (ERMATEC SARL [FR]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [Y] 4,5 | by applicant | WO9422645 | EP0842018 |