EP2072012 - Method for calibration of a camera augmented C-arm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2009/26] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heibel, Hauke Hiltenspergerstrasse 10 80798 München / DE | 02 /
Navab, Nassir, Professor Schrämelstrasse 185 81247 München / DE | 03 /
Traub, Joerg Roter-Turm-Platz 5A 81371 München / DE | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/26] | Kley, Hansjörg, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07024500.6 | 18.12.2007 | [2009/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2072012 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
A61B6/587 (EP);
A61B6/4441 (EP);
A61B6/5235 (EP);
A61B6/583 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kalibrierung eines kameraerweiterten C-Arms | [2009/26] | English: | Method for calibration of a camera augmented C-arm | [2009/26] | French: | Procédé pour l'étalonnage d'un bras en C doté d'une caméra | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 07.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YX]US5923727 (NAVAB NASSIR [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * [X] 13; | [X]DE19819928 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) [X] 13* abstract *; | [DA]US6227704 (BANI-HASHEMI ALI [US], et al) [DA] 1-13 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 3 *; | [DYA]DE102005062582 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DY] 1-12 * the whole document * [A] 13 | by applicant | US6227704 | US6229873 | US6447163 | US6473489 |