EP1935479 - Hybrid process for saltwater desalination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, CY, LI, TR | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chmiel, Horst Haslangstrasse 28 80689 München / DE | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Flosdorff, Jürgen, et al Huss, Flosdorff & Partner GbR Klarweinstraße 39 82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Flosdorff, Jürgen, et al Huss, Flosdorff & Partner, Alleestrasse 33 82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07024652.5 | 19.12.2007 | [2008/26] | Priority number, date | DE20061060592 | 21.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006060592 | [2008/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1935479 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1935479 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | [2008/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1935479 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/04, C02F1/44, // C02F1/78, C02F1/28, C02F103/08 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
C02F1/441 (EP);
B01D61/04 (EP);
B01D61/58 (EP);
B01D65/02 (EP);
B01D2311/04 (EP);
B01D2321/12 (EP);
B01D61/025 (EP);
B01D61/145 (EP);
C02F1/283 (EP);
C02F1/444 (EP);
C02F1/78 (EP);
C02F2103/08 (EP);
Y02A20/131 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B01D2311/04, B01D2311/12, B01D2311/2626, B01D2311/2649 (EP);
B01D2311/04, B01D2311/2661, B01D2311/2626, B01D2311/2649 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | Hybridprozess zur Meerwasserentsalzung | [2008/26] | English: | Hybrid process for saltwater desalination | [2008/26] | French: | Procédé hybride destiné à la désalinisation de l'eau de mer | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 03.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE ItN Nanovation AG Untertürkheimer Strasse 25 66117 Saarbrücken / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE ItN Nanovation AG Untertürkheimer Strasse 25 66117 Saarbrücken / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | 29.10.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.11.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.11.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.02.2012 | 21.02.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.06.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/44] | 15.06.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 30.09.2009 | CY | 30.09.2009 | CZ | 30.09.2009 | DK | 30.09.2009 | EE | 30.09.2009 | FI | 30.09.2009 | IE | 30.09.2009 | IT | 30.09.2009 | LI | 30.09.2009 | LT | 30.09.2009 | LV | 30.09.2009 | MT | 30.09.2009 | NL | 30.09.2009 | PL | 30.09.2009 | RO | 30.09.2009 | SE | 30.09.2009 | SI | 30.09.2009 | SK | 30.09.2009 | TR | 30.09.2009 | AT | 19.12.2009 | LU | 19.12.2009 | BE | 31.12.2009 | BG | 31.12.2009 | GR | 31.12.2009 | ES | 10.01.2010 | IS | 30.01.2010 | PT | 01.02.2010 | HU | 01.04.2010 | MC | 01.07.2010 | [2012/49] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
MT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
AT | 19.12.2009 | ||
LU | 19.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
HU | 01.04.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
MT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
LU | 19.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | EE | 30.09.2009 | |
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/15] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6030535 (HAYASHI YUKIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005051849 (KIM HYUNG SU [KR]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005092799 (US FILTER WASTEWATER GROUP INC [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006175256 (MASTEN SUSAN J [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A] - VAN HOOF S C J M ET AL, "Dead-end ultrafiltration as alternative pre-treatment to reverse osmosis in seawater desalination: a case study", DESALINATION, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010920), vol. 139, no. 1-3, ISSN 0011-9164, pages 161 - 168, XP004320382 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0011-9164(01)00306-X | by applicant | WO9703926 | EP1044928 | DE69828821T | WO2006030081 | - SCHLICHTER ET AL., DESALINATION, (2004), vol. 168, pages 307 - 317 |