EP1940156 - Television system with installed telephone function, and remote controller device directed thereto [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zuo, Guokun c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | 02 /
Masaki, Yasuo c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | 03 /
Okazaki, Akinori c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | 04 /
Kokado, Masao c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | 05 /
Murakami, Sadanori c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | 06 /
Takeshita, Masahiro c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | 07 /
Tsubota, Hirono c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07024834.9 | 20.12.2007 | [2008/27] | Priority number, date | JP20060352309 | 27.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006352309 | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1940156 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1940156 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, H04N7/14, H04M1/725 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
H04N7/173 (EP,US);
H04M1/2535 (EP,US);
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/42222 (EP,US);
H04N21/4788 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/27] | H04N5/445, H04N7/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Title | German: | Fernsehsystem mit installierter Telefonfunktion und darauf gerichtete Fernsteuerungsvorrichtung | [2008/27] | English: | Television system with installed telephone function, and remote controller device directed thereto | [2008/27] | French: | Système de télévision avec fonction téléphonique installée et dispositif de contrôleur à distance dirigé vers celui-ci | [2008/27] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.01.2012 | 07.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/17] | 17.12.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/17] | 17.01.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6151490 (SCHULTHEISS CHRISTOPHER J [US]) [X] 1,9 * column 3, lines 48-62 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 20 *; | [X]US6359636 (SCHINDLER JEFFREY [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 8, lines 3-8 * * column 13, lines 55-60 * * column 15, line 66 - column 16, line 1 * * column 17, lines 26-43 * * column 21, lines 2,3; figures 3,12 *; | [X]WO0230121 (DIGEO INC [US]) [X] 1,4-9 * page 3, lines 1-17 * * page 4, lines 2,3 * * page 13, lines 18-21 *; | [X]US6628964 (BATES CARY LEE [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 41 ** column 5, lines 7-21 *; | [X]US2006040638 (MCQUAIDE ARNOLD JR [US]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * paragraphs [0022] - [0031] - [0036]; figures 1,4 *; | [A]WO2006045617 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1,9 * page 2, lines 23-30; figures 31A,31B,31C * | Examination | US2002102949 | US2002149705 | US2003041331 | by applicant | US6359636 | US2006040638 |