EP2073135 - Blood glucose system with time synchronisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2018/40] |
Former [2016/36] | For:DE
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2009/26] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F.HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köhler, Matthias Hurststrasse 4A 69514 Laudenbach / DE | 02 /
Blasberg, Peter Hammeltrogweg 16 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2018/40] |
Former [2014/44] | Jany, Peter, et al Patentanwalt Karlstraße 87 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2012/21] | Jany und Petersen Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Karlstraße 87 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2009/26] | Jany, Peter Patentanwalt Karlstrasse 87 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 07024884.4 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2073135 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2073135 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
G16H20/17 (EP,US);
A61B5/0002 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/4839 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (US);
G16Z99/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/40] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Blutglukosesystem mit Zeitsynchronisation | [2009/26] | English: | Blood glucose system with time synchronisation | [2009/26] | French: | Système de détermination du taux de glycémie à synchronisation temporelle | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.08.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 08.08.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.08.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2007 | CY | 03.10.2018 | CZ | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | ES | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | MT | 03.10.2018 | PL | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | SE | 03.10.2018 | SI | 03.10.2018 | SK | 03.10.2018 | TR | 03.10.2018 | AT | 21.12.2018 | IE | 21.12.2018 | LU | 21.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | PT | 03.02.2019 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 21.12.2007 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
MT | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
AT | 21.12.2018 | ||
IE | 21.12.2018 | ||
LU | 21.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/23] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
MT | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
AT | 21.12.2018 | ||
IE | 21.12.2018 | ||
LU | 21.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
MT | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IE | 21.12.2018 | ||
LU | 21.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
MT | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
IE | 21.12.2018 | ||
LU | 21.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
IE | 21.12.2018 | ||
LU | 21.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
IE | 21.12.2018 | ||
LU | 21.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 21.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 21.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE19733445 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5921938 (AOYAMA DAVID D [US], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [X]WO2005043306 (ZOLL MEDICAL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005103351 (STOMBERG CHARLES R [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0010] - [0015] - [0026] - [0086]; figures 1-10 *; | [A]EP1758039 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4653022 | DE19733445 | US5925021 | US6216096 | EP1115435 | DE69534225T | EP1762955 |