EP1936937 - Call server selection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockstar Consortium US LP 2201 Lakeside Boulevard Suite 1N-110 Richardson, TX 75082 / US | [2014/24] |
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St Laurent, Québec H4S 2A9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sylvain, Dany 6 rue de Bandol Gatineau Quebec J8T 6A6 / CA | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Brophy, David Timothy, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Brophy, David Timothy, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2008/26] | Boyce, Conor, et al F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 07024920.6 | 21.12.2007 | [2008/26] | Priority number, date | US20060615294 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: US 615294 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1936937 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1936937 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M7/00 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
H04M7/003 (EP,US);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04M7/006 (US);
H04M7/1285 (EP,US);
H04M2203/2066 (EP,US);
H04M7/0006 (US);
H04M7/128 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | Rufserver-Auswahl | [2008/26] | English: | Call server selection | [2008/26] | French: | Sélection de serveur d'appels | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 06.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/44] | 24.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1093282 (SIEMENS INF & COMM NETWORKS [US]) [X] 1-18* paragraphs [0013] - [0017] - [0019] , [0020] *; | [X]US6310941 (CRUTCHER PAUL D [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 52 * * column 9, line 8 - column 14, line 9 * * column 15, line 1 - line 15 * * column 17, line 14 - column 19, line 41 * * column 20, line 5 - line 10 *; | [X]US2005021761 (THOMAS STEPHEN A [US]) [X] 1-18 * figures 2,3 * * paragraphs [0007] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0028] - [0034] * | Examination | US2001050911 | EP1016261 | by applicant | US20050316431 |