EP2073003 - Measurement and evaluation device for finding deficiencies in a test piece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clossen-Von Lanken Schulz, Michael Spoldersweg 3 47608 Geldern / DE | 02 /
Opheys, Michael Ginsterheide 11 41334 Nettetal / DE | [2009/26] | Application number, filing date | 07024983.4 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2073003 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/26, G01N29/06 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
G01N29/069 (EP);
G01N29/262 (EP);
G01N2291/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/09] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mess- und auswerteeinrichtung zum ermittlen von ungänzen in einem prüfkörper | [2009/26] | English: | Measurement and evaluation device for finding deficiencies in a test piece | [2009/26] | French: | Dispositif de mesure et d'évaluation destiné à déterminer des défauts dans une éprouvette | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 25.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5932807 (MALLART RAOUL [FR]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]US2002088282 (ZAYICEK PAUL A [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * figures 4A,B *; | [A]US2007000328 (BUTTRAM JONATHAN [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2007163348 (HECKEL THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0045] *; | [X] - KOMURA I ET AL, "Crack detection and sizing technique by ultrasonic and electromagnetic methods", NUCLEAR ENGINEERING AND DESIGN ELSEVIER NETHERLANDS, (200106), vol. 206, no. 2-3, ISSN 0029-5493, pages 351 - 362, XP002485128 [X] 1-12 * paragraph [02.3] * * figures 13-15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0029-5493(00)00421-0 |