EP1942126 - High productivity alkoxylation processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience LLC 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | [2008/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McDaniel, Kenneth, G. 421 Woodbridge Drive Charleston Wv 25311 / US | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Perchenek, Nils Bayer MaterialScience AG L&P/P&L 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2008/37] |
Former [2008/28] | Perchenek, Nils Bayer MaterialScience AG Law and Patents Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07025168.1 | 28.12.2007 | [2008/28] | Priority number, date | US20070879212P | 08.01.2007 Original published format: US 879212 P | US20070893452 | 16.08.2007 Original published format: US 893452 | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1942126 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/00 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
C08G65/2696 (EP,US);
C08G65/26 (KR);
C08G65/10 (KR);
C08G65/2606 (EP,US);
C08G65/2651 (EP,US);
C08G65/266 (EP,US);
C08G65/2663 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Title | German: | Alkoxylierungsverfahren mit hoher Produktivität | [2008/28] | English: | High productivity alkoxylation processes | [2008/28] | French: | Processus d'alkoxylation haute productivité | [2008/28] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 13.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/39] | 03.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/39] | Divisional application(s) | EP11154052.2 / EP2325230 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0092256 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [XA]US5057627 (EDWARDS CHARLES L [US]); | [XA]WO9803571 (ARCO CHEM TECH [US], et al); | [XA]WO0051955 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) | by applicant | US3404109 | US3538043 | US3900518 | US3941849 | US4453022 | US4472860 | US4775653 | US4886917 | US5012012 | US5118570 | US5145883 | US5191104 | US5210325 | US5292910 | US5374750 | US5482908 | US5539135 | US5600020 | US5689012 | US5777177 | US6365541 | US6504061 | US2003009059 | US6514898 | US6646145 | WO2004018096 | US6765116 | US7012164 | US2007060770 |