EP1918445 - Tub with ballast weight for a washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Strasse 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Strasse 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hollenhorst, Matthias Helfkamp 33 59556 Lippstadt / DE | [2008/19] | Application number, filing date | 07033518.7 | 16.10.2007 | [2008/19] | Priority number, date | DE20061052514 | 06.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006052514 | [2008/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1918445 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1918445 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/20, D06F37/26 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
D06F37/265 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/19] | Title | German: | Laugenbehälter mit Ballastgewicht für eine Waschmaschine | [2008/19] | English: | Tub with ballast weight for a washing machine | [2008/19] | French: | Cuve dotée d'un poids de ballast pour une machine à laver | [2008/19] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 11.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.07.2009 | CZ | 01.07.2009 | DK | 01.07.2009 | EE | 01.07.2009 | FI | 01.07.2009 | IE | 01.07.2009 | LT | 01.07.2009 | LV | 01.07.2009 | MT | 01.07.2009 | NL | 01.07.2009 | PL | 01.07.2009 | RO | 01.07.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | SI | 01.07.2009 | SK | 01.07.2009 | TR | 01.07.2009 | BG | 01.10.2009 | GR | 02.10.2009 | AT | 16.10.2009 | LU | 16.10.2009 | BE | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | IS | 01.11.2009 | PT | 02.11.2009 | HU | 02.01.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
MT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
AT | 16.10.2009 | ||
LU | 16.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
HU | 02.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
MT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
AT | 16.10.2009 | ||
LU | 16.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CZ | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
AT | 16.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CZ | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | CZ | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | EE | 01.07.2009 | |
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | EE | 01.07.2009 | |
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | SI | 01.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4238685 (SCHWARZENBERGER HAUSGERAETE EN [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 1, lines 3-64 * * column 2, lines 14-29 * * figures 1-4 * * claims 1-6 *; | [AD]EP0798412 (BALAY SA [ES]) [AD] 1,2 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 21 * * figures 1-4 *; | [AD]DE10215254 (WIRTHWEIN AG [DE]) [AD] 1,5 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0036] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0041] ** figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2006064429 (ARCELIK AS [TR], et al) [A] 1,5 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0029] * * figures 1-12 * |