EP1923241 - Motor vehicle with air conditioning and method for an independent air conditioning system for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enerday GmbH Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Enerday GmbH Kraillinger Str. 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Webasto AG Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfalzgraf, Manfred Schmidschneiderstrasse 22b 82211 Herrsching am Ammersee / DE | 02 /
Bedenbecker, Markus Feldstrasse 22 82131 Gauting / DE | 03 /
Boltze, Matthias Asternstrasse 5 17039 Wulkenzin (OT Neuendorf) / DE | 04 /
Engl, Andreas Willbaldstrasse 117 80689 München / DE | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | Schumacher & Willsau Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Nymphenburger Strasse 42 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/21] | Schumacher & Willsau Patentanwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Strasse 42 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07033537.7 | 30.10.2007 | [2008/21] | Priority number, date | DE20061053912 | 15.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006053912 | [2008/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1923241 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
B60H1/00428 (EP);
B60H1/00278 (EP);
B60H1/00778 (EP);
B60H2001/00242 (EP);
B60H2001/003 (EP);
Y02T10/88 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug mit einer Klimaanlage und Verfahren zur Standklimatisierung eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [2008/21] | English: | Motor vehicle with air conditioning and method for an independent air conditioning system for a motor vehicle | [2008/21] | French: | Véhicule automobile doté d'une climatisation et procédé de climatisation d'un véhicule automobile | [2008/21] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 20.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2180760 (MAYO EDWARD L) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9,11-13 * sentences 1-40; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE10258195 (WEBASTO THERMOSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0023]; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP1518729 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 1-3,5-10,12-14* paragraphs [0062] , [0092] - [0094]; figures 9,10,17 * |