EP1811475 - Method and apparatus for inductive heating of a food container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PepsiCo, Inc. 700 Anderson Hill Road Purchase New York 10577 / US | [2007/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Avendano, Jose G. 2732 Kipling Drive Springfield, Illinois 62711 / US | 02 /
Segiet, William 5 Rita Drive Bethel, CT 06801 / US | 03 /
Thompson, Leslie L. 1100 Cheese Factory Road Honeoye Falls, New York 14472 / US | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Vernout, Robert, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Vernout, Robert, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/34] | Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2007/30] | Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07075056.7 | 19.01.2007 | [2007/30] | Priority number, date | US20060336291 | 20.01.2006 Original published format: US 336291 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1811475 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G07F9/10 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
G07F9/105 (EP,US);
G07F17/0078 (EP,US);
H05B6/129 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum induktiven Erhitzen eines Lebensmittelbehälters | [2007/30] | English: | Method and apparatus for inductive heating of a food container | [2007/30] | French: | Procédé et appareil de chauffage à induction d'un récipient alimentaire | [2007/30] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 06.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 06.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07325971 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH10222741 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [X]JP2000231666 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 14-18 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2003067823 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-22* abstract * |