EP1815803 - Gerd treatment apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/32] | Tissue reconfiguration | ||
[2007/39] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242-2839 / US | [2011/25] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states NDO Surgical, Inc. Suite 7, 125 High Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laufer, Michael D. 1259 El Camino Real No. 211 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
Cerier, Jeffrey C. 11 Orchard Street Franklin, MA 02038 / US | 03 /
Cruz, Amos G. 25 Vine Street Franklin, MA 02038 / US | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/32] | Arends, William Gerrit, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07075291.0 | 22.06.2000 | [2007/32] | Priority number, date | US19990140492P | 22.06.1999 Original published format: US 140492 P | US20000520273 | 07.03.2000 Original published format: US 520273 | US20000519945 | 07.03.2000 Original published format: US 519945 | US20000574424 | 19.05.2000 Original published format: US 574424 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1815803 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1815803 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1815803 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/064, A61B17/068 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
A61B17/0686 (EP,US);
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61B17/0401 (EP,US);
A61B17/0482 (EP,US);
A61B17/0643 (EP,US);
A61B17/068 (EP,US);
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B17/0218 (EP,US);
A61B17/0467 (EP,US);
A61B17/0485 (EP,US);
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00296 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00349 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00557 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00827 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0404 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0409 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0417 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0419 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0458 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0464 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0472 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0474 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0475 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0496 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06052 (EP,US);
A61B2017/061 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2905 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2915 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2916 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2917 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2927 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2932 (EP,US);
A61B2017/308 (EP,US);
A61B2090/065 (EP,US);
A61M25/0147 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/32] | Title | German: | GERD Gewebe-Rekonfiguration | [2010/47] | English: | Gerd treatment apparatus | [2010/47] | French: | Reconfiguration de tissus GERD | [2010/47] |
Former [2007/32] | Gewebe-Rekonfiguration | ||
Former [2007/32] | Tissue reconfiguration | ||
Former [2007/32] | Reconfiguration de tissus | Examination procedure | 18.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00943084.4 / EP1187559 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.2012
G-SURG GMBH Weinbergstrasse 28 83370 SEEON-SEEBRUCK / DE Opponent's representative Babeluk, Michael Patentanwalt Florianigasse 26/3 1080 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.2012
G-SURG GMBH Weinbergstrasse 28 83370 SEEON-SEEBRUCK / DE Opponent's representative Babeluk, Michael Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17 1150 Wien / AT | 27.03.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 19.08.2013 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2013/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.08.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.05.2011 | BE | 18.05.2011 | CY | 18.05.2011 | DK | 18.05.2011 | FI | 18.05.2011 | NL | 18.05.2011 | SE | 18.05.2011 | IE | 22.06.2011 | LU | 22.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | GR | 19.08.2011 | ES | 29.08.2011 | PT | 19.09.2011 | GB | 22.06.2012 | IT | 22.06.2012 | FR | 02.07.2012 | DE | 01.01.2013 | [2015/22] |
Former [2012/11] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 19.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8911827 (NIERMAN DAVID M [US]) [A] 1,11* abstract *; | [X]EP0593920 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,8 * figures 1,8 * * column 4, lines 54-57 * * column 2, lines 12-15 * * column 2, lines 28-36 * * column 5, lines 31-39 * * column 10, lines 42-54 *; | [X]US5403326 (HARRISON MICHAEL R [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 5, line 53 - column 7, line 59 *; | [X]US5897562 (BOLANOS HENRY [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10 * abstract * * column 5, line 9 - column 9, line 65 *; | [X]WO9922649 (SYMBIOSIS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10 * figures 1,11-15 * * page 23, line 12 - page 24, line 20 * * page 21, lines 4-16 * | by applicant | US5403326 | - O'CONNOR KW; LEHMAN GA, GASTROINTEST ENDOSC, (1988), vol. 34, pages 106 - 12 | - DONAHUE PE ET AL., GASTROINTEST ENDOSC, (1990), vol. 36, pages 253 - 6 | - MCGOURAN RCM ET AL., GUT, (1988), vol. 29, pages 275 - 8 | - ISMAIL T ET AL., BR J SURG, (1995), vol. 82, pages 943 - 7 | - MCGOURAN RCM ET AL., GUT, (1989), vol. 30, pages 1309 - 12 |