Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100313987B | Global Dossier | 23.11.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | KR930702205 | 24.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100292103B | Global Dossier | 01.06.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US9200522 | 22.01.1992 | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1961312 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2010 | A3 | EP1961312 | 27.08.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | EP01200067 | 22.01.1992 | EP92904388 | 22.01.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1787532 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2010 | A3 | EP1787532 | 23.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | EP01200067 | 22.01.1992 | EP92904388 | 22.01.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1092352 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2003 | A3 | EP1092352 | 18.04.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | EP92904388 | 22.01.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0568606 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2001 | B1 | EP0568606 | 19.01.1994 | A4 | EP0568606 | 10.11.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9200522 | 22.01.1992 | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU661297B | Global Dossier | 20.07.1995 | B2 | AU1239292 | 27.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US9200522 | 22.01.1992 | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1832181 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2010 | A3 | EP1832181 | 12.09.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | EP01200067 | 22.01.1992 | EP92904388 | 22.01.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE200619T | 15.05.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9200522 | 22.01.1992 | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9205526 | 19.04.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US9200522 | 22.01.1992 | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE568606T | 25.02.1999 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9200522 | 22.01.1992 | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69231793T | 08.11.2001 | T2 | DE69231793D1 | 23.05.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9200522 | 22.01.1992 | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0568606T | 23.07.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US9200522 | 22.01.1992 | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3036139T | 28.09.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US9200522 | 22.01.1992 | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL114253 | 13.07.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | IL10073395 | 21.06.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100321543B | 12.09.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US9200522 | 22.01.1992 | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2093996 | 27.10.1997 | C1 | Priority number | Date | US9200522 | 22.01.1992 | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5374657 | 20.12.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US94473992 | 14.09.1992 | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5550156 | 27.08.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US94473993 | 14.09.1993 | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | US35847494 | 19.12.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9212711 | Global Dossier | 06.08.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2731035B | Global Dossier | 25.03.1998 | B2 | JPH06505153 | 16.06.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2101274 | 15.12.1998 | C | CA2101274 | 25.07.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2157898T | 01.09.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL100733 | 31.12.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX183638 | 06.01.1997 | B | MX9200320 | 01.10.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ241359 | 26.08.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | OA10348 | 19.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG49307 | 18.05.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA92452 | 28.10.1992 | B | Priority number | Date | US64545791 | 24.01.1991 | Type | Earlier application | EP1092352 | EP0568606 |