EP1832181 - Microbial oil mixtures and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARTEK BIOSCIENCES CORPORATION 6480 Dobbin Road Columbia, MD 21045 / US | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kyle, David J. 1801 Narbeth Road Catonsville, MD 21228 / US | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/12] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/37] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07075341.3 | 22.01.1992 | [2007/49] | Priority number, date | US19910645457 | 24.01.1991 Original published format: US 645457 | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1832181 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1832181 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/30, A61K31/20, A61K31/23 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
A61K31/23 (EP,US);
A23D9/00 (KR);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/20 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/1868, A23V2250/1862, A23V2250/187 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/37] | A23L1/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/03] |
Former [2007/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mischungen von mikrobiellen Ölen und deren Verwendungen | [2007/37] | English: | Microbial oil mixtures and uses thereof | [2007/37] | French: | Mélanges d'huiles microbiennes et utilisations de ces mélanges | [2007/37] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 17.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/27] | 19.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01200067.5 / EP1092352 | EP92904388.3 / EP0568606 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19920904388) is 21.06.1994 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0195570 (EFAMOL LTD [GB]) [A] 1-67 * example 1; claims 1,5 *; | DE3603000 [ ] (MILUPA AG [DE]); | [I]EP0231904 (MILUPA AG [DE]) [I] 1-20,29-35,43,45-51,58-64,67 * claims 1,5; table 2 * * page 2, lines 1-10,31,43 - page 3, line 9 * * page 4, lines 3-33 *; | [A]WO8801861 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]) [A] 1-67 * claims 1,2,12,22,26; tables 2,3 * * page 4, lines 1-6,28 - page 5, lines 9,27-33 * * page 8, lines 22-24 * * page 12, lines 14-31 *; | [A]EP0266323 (KABIVITRUM AB [SE]) [A] 1-67 * example 7; claims 1,3,5,11,20 * * page 2, lines 25-29 * * page 3, lines 15-25 *; | [I]JPS63295527 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD) [I] 21-67 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0322227 (SUNTORY LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-67 * claims 1,9 *; | [A]JPH0286789 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD) [A] 1-67 * abstract *; | [I]EP0404058 (MILUPA AG [DE]) [I] 1-67 * claims 1,10,11; table 2 * * page 2, lines 31-47 * * page 3, lines 25-32,40,41 * * page 4, lines 14-22,37-40 * * page 5, lines 9-52 * * page 6, lines 7-12 * * page 8 *; | [XP]WO9111918 (MARTEK CORP [US]) [XP] 21,25-26,44,56,65-66 * page 3, lines 21-31; claims 1,4,39 * * page 13, line 7 - page 14, line 13 *; | [A] - YONGMANITCHAI W ET AL, "Omega-3 fatty acids: Alternative sources of production", PROCESS BIOCHEMISTRY, XX, XX, (19890801), pages 117 - 125, XP003004328 [A] 21-28,36-42,44,52-57,65-66 * page 117, lines 1-4 * * page 117, column R, lines 8-11 * * page 118, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 120, column R, paragraph 5 - page 124, column L, line 4; tables 1,3 * | [A] - YAMADA H ET AL, "BIOTECHNOLOGICAL PROCESSES FOR PRODUCTION OF POLY-UNSATURATED FATTY ACIDS", JOURNAL OF DISPERSION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19890101), vol. 10, no. 4/05, ISSN 0193-2691, pages 561 - 579, XP000884958 [A] 1-67 * page 568, line 1 - page 569, paragraph 2; tables 2-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/01932698908943188 | [A] - SHINMEN Y ET AL, "PRODUCTION OF ARACHIDONIC ACID BY MORTIERELLA FUNGI SELECTION OF A POTENT PRODUCER AND OPTIMIZATION OF CULTURE CONDITIONS FOR LARGE-SCALE PRODUCTION", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (19890101), vol. 31, no. 1, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 11 - 16, XP001027373 [A] 1-67 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00252518 | [A] - HARRINGTON G W ET AL, "THE POLYUNSATURATED FATTY ACIDS OF MARINE DINOFLAGELLATES", JOURNAL OF PROTOZOOLOGY, LAWRENCE, KANSAS, US, (1970), vol. 17, no. 2, ISSN 0022-3921, pages 213 - 219, XP000960326 [A] 1-67 * tables 1-3 * | [A] - BEACH D H ET AL, "BIOSYNTHESIS OF OLEIC ACID AND DOCOSAHEXAENOIC ACID BY A HETEROTROPHIC MARINE DINOFLAGELLATE CRYPTHECODINIUM COHNII", BBA - LIPIDS AND LIPID METABOLISM, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV. AMSTERDAM, NL, (1974), vol. 369, no. 1, ISSN 0005-2760, pages 16 - 24, XP000579716 [A] 1-67 * page 16, paragraphs 1,3 - page 17, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0005-2760(74)90187-8 |