EP1854901 - Corrosion resistant alloy and components made therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntington Alloys Corporation 3200 Riverside Drive Huntington, WV 25705 / US | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crum, James Roy 20 Quail Drive Ona West Virginia 25545 / US | 02 /
Eisinger, Nathan Charles 580 Tallwood Road Huntington West Virginia 25705 / US | 03 /
Gosnay, Stephen Marc 219 Iroquois Trail Ona West Virginia 25705 / US | 04 /
Smith, Gaylord Darrell 120 Stamford Park Drive Huntington West Virginia 25705 / US | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Korsten, Marius, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [2007/46] | Application number, filing date | 07075347.0 | 04.05.2007 | [2007/46] | Priority number, date | US20060798565P | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 798565 P | US20070788931P | 23.04.2007 Original published format: US 788931 P | [2007/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1854901 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C21D6/00, C21D9/08, C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/42, C22C38/44, C22C38/50, F01N13/16, F01N13/18 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
C22C38/44 (EP,US);
C22C38/22 (KR);
C21D6/004 (EP,US);
C21D9/08 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/42 (EP,US);
C22C38/50 (EP,US);
F01N13/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/46] | C22C38/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2008/30] |
Former [2007/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Korrosionsbeständige Legierung und daraus hergestellte Komponenten | [2007/46] | English: | Corrosion resistant alloy and components made therefrom | [2007/46] | French: | Alliage résistant à la corrosion et composants fabriqués avec | [2007/46] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 15.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/42] | 28.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0155011 (INCO ALLOYS INT [US]) [A] 1-27 * page 3, lines 8-14 * * table 2 *; | [A]US5160389 (AKIYAMA SHUNICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-27 * column 2, lines 28-44 *; | [A]EP0838533 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-25 * page 3, lines 3-10 *; | [A]GB2318802 (INCO ALLOYS INT [US]) [A] 1-27 * page 5, paragraphs 2-4 * * page 9, lines 15,21-23 *; | [A]JP2001107196 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-25* abstract *; | [A]WO2004072316 (ATI PROPERTIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 9 * | by applicant | EP0155011 |