EP1855384 - Accumulator for adaptive sigma-delta modulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Med-El Elektromedizinische Geräte GmbH Fürstenweg 77a 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zierhofer, Clemens M. Huettstrasse 50 6250 Kundl / AT | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Lucke, Andreas, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Froud, Clive Clive Froud & Co Limited 7 Hurst Close Tenterden Ashford Kent TN30 6UG / GB | ||
Former [2007/46] | Froud, Clive Clive Froud & Co Limited 7 Hurst Close Tenterden Kent TN30 6UG / GB | Application number, filing date | 07075367.8 | 26.09.2003 | [2007/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1855384 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1855384 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H03M3/02 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
H03M3/492 (EP);
H03M3/43 (EP);
H03M3/456 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Title | German: | Akkumulator für adaptive Sigma-Delta-Modulation | [2007/46] | English: | Accumulator for adaptive sigma-delta modulation | [2007/46] | French: | Accumulateur pour modulation sigma-delta adaptative | [2007/46] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 09.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03758484.4 / EP1665544 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 25.08.2010 | CY | 25.08.2010 | CZ | 25.08.2010 | DK | 25.08.2010 | EE | 25.08.2010 | FI | 25.08.2010 | IT | 25.08.2010 | NL | 25.08.2010 | RO | 25.08.2010 | SE | 25.08.2010 | SI | 25.08.2010 | SK | 25.08.2010 | TR | 25.08.2010 | IE | 26.09.2010 | LU | 26.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | BG | 25.11.2010 | GB | 25.11.2010 | GR | 26.11.2010 | ES | 06.12.2010 | PT | 27.12.2010 | HU | 26.02.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | BE | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 26.09.2010 | ||
LU | 26.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GB | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
HU | 26.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 26.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GB | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
HU | 26.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | BE | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 26.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GB | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | BE | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 26.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | BE | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 26.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | BE | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | BE | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | BE | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4860012 (RICH DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * abstract *; | [A]WO0209292 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * page 5, line 5 - page 7, line 28; figures 3A-5 *; | [DX]US6535153 (ZIERHOFER CLEMENS M [AT]) [DX] 1,3,4,6,9-11,13,17,22-24 * column 1, lines 9-11; figures 3-8 * * column 2, lines 24-62 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 66 * * column 7, line 39 - column 9, line 6 *; | [X]US2003146865 (ZIERHOFER CLEMENS M [AT]) [X] 1,3-5,9-11,13,17,22-24 * page 1, paragraph 2; figures 3-8; claims 1,10 * * page 1, paragraphs 10-12 * * page 2, paragraph 23 - page 3, paragraph 33 * * page 4, paragraphs 44-49 *; | [DX] - ZIERHOFER C M, "ADAPTIVE SIGMA-DELTA MODULATION WITH ONE-BIT QUANTIZATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS II: ANALOG AND DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (20000501), vol. 47, no. 5, ISSN 1057-7130, pages 408 - 415, XP001009131 [DX] 1,3,4,6,9-11,13,17,22-24 * page 408, paragraph I - page 409, paragraph I; figures 3-8 * * page 409, paragraph III - page 415, paragraph IX * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/82.842109 | [A] - ZIERHOFER C M ED - ZAJC B ET AL, "Numerical adaptive delta modulation-a technique for digital signal representation in ASIC applications", ELECTROTECHNICAL CONFERENCE, 1991. PROCEEDINGS., 6TH MEDITERRANEAN LJUBLJANA, SLOVENIA 22-24 MAY 1991, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19910522), ISBN 0-87942-655-1, pages 331 - 334, XP010039836 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MELCON.1991.161844 |