EP1873456 - Device for injecting a mix of air and fuel, combustion chamber and turbomachine equipped with such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNECMA 2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2016/01] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states SNECMA 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cayre, Alain 2 rue Grande 77830 Pamfou / FR | 02 /
Desaulty, Michel 2 rue de la Pierre Décollée 77240 Vert St Denis / FR | 03 /
Sandelis, Denis 1 rue André Dubois 77370 Nangis / FR | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2011/08] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2008/01] | Nguyen, Dominique Snecma Département Propriété Intellectuelle - WRS/DJIB 77550 Moissy Cramayel / FR | Application number, filing date | 07075477.5 | 15.06.2007 | [2008/01] | Priority number, date | FR20060005852 | 29.06.2006 Original published format: FR 0605852 | [2008/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1873456 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1873456 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/14 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
F23R3/14 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2016/01] |
Former [2008/37] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einspritzen einer Mischung aus Luft und Treibstoff, Brennkammer und Strömungsmaschine, die mit einer solchen Vorrichtung ausgestattet ist | [2008/01] | English: | Device for injecting a mix of air and fuel, combustion chamber and turbomachine equipped with such a device | [2008/01] | French: | Dispositif d'injection d'un mélange d'air et de carburant, chambre de combustion et turbomachine munies d'un tel dispositif | [2008/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 10.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1158246 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,6 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1278012 (SNECMA MOTEURS [FR]) [A] 1* figures 3,4 *; | [X]EP1314933 (HISPANO SUIZA SA [FR]) [X] 1,11,12 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0026]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1508743 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | by applicant | FR2753779 | EP1158246 | EP1314933 |