Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] |
30.08.2012 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
13.08.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.02.2012 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
26.07.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.07.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.05.2010 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
18.12.2009 | First examination report | |
15.12.2009 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
27.07.2009 | Change: Renewal fee paid | |
27.07.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.11.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
24.10.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |
16.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant | |
14.03.2008 | Publication of search report | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
14.03.2008 | Change - classification | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
28.12.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] |