EP1849860 - Process for preparing an immunogenic factor of Corynebacterium diphtheriae using a culture medium with yeast extract as aminoacid source and no protein complexes of animal origin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/44] | Culture medium with yeast or soy bean extract as aminoacid source and no protein complexes of animal origin | ||
[2010/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2011/27] |
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena (SI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olivieri, Roberto Via Dario Neri, 53 53100 Siena / IT | 02 /
Sabbatini, Fabio Via della Repubblica, 4 53014 Monteroni d'Arbia / IT | 03 /
Kontakou, Maria Via Don Bosco, 16 Casagiove 81100 Caserta / IT | 04 /
Tagliaferri, Lucia Via Casato di Sopra, 59 53100 Siena / IT | 05 /
Giglioli, Antonella Via Mario Pratesi, 3 53100 Siena / IT | 06 /
Rappuoli, Rino c/o Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. 4560 Horton Street Emeryville CA 94608 / US | [2010/46] |
Former [2008/09] | 01 /
Olivieri, Roberto Via Dario Neri, 53 53100 Siena / IT | ||
02 /
Sabbatini, Fabio Via della Repubblica, 4 53014 Monteroni d'Arbia / IT | |||
03 /
Kontakou, Maria Via Don Bosco, 16 Casagiove 81100 Caserta / IT | |||
04 /
Tagliaferri, Lucia Via Casato di Sopra, 59 53100 Siena / IT | |||
05 /
Giglioli, Antonella Via Mario Pratesi, 6 53100 Siena / IT | |||
06 /
Rappuoli, Rino c/o Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. 4560 Horton Street Emeryville CA 94608 / US | |||
Former [2007/44] | 01 /
Olivieri, Roberto Via Dario Neri, 53 53100 Siena / IT | ||
02 /
Sabbatini, Fabio Via della Repubblica, 4 53014 Monteroni d'Arbia / IT | |||
03 /
Kontakou, Maria Via Don Bosco, 16 Casagiove 81100 Caserta / IT | |||
04 /
Tagliaferri, Lucia Via Casato di Sopra, 59 53100 Siena / IT | |||
05 /
Giglioli, Antonella Via Mario Pratesi, 6 53100 Siena / IT | |||
06 /
Rappuoli, Rino Via Calamandrei, 39 Quercegrossa 53035 Monteriggioni / IT | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/44] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels and Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07075660.6 | 28.05.1998 | [2007/44] | Priority number, date | GB19970010981 | 28.05.1997 Original published format: GB 9710981 | GB19980006802 | 30.03.1998 Original published format: GB 9806802 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1849860 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1849860 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1849860 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, A61K39/102, C07K16/12 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C12N1/205 (US);
C12R2001/21 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines immunogenen Faktors von Corynebacterium diphtheriae unter Verwendung eines Kulturmediums mit Hefeextrakt als Aminosäurenquelle und ohne Proteinkomplexe tierischer Herkunft | [2010/16] | English: | Process for preparing an immunogenic factor of Corynebacterium diphtheriae using a culture medium with yeast extract as aminoacid source and no protein complexes of animal origin | [2010/15] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un facteur immunogene de Corynebacterium diphtheriae en utilisant un milieu de culture avec extrait de levure en tant que source d'acides aminés et dépourvu de complexes protéiques d'origine animale | [2010/15] |
Former [2007/44] | Kulturmedium mit Hefe- oder Sojabohnenextrakt als Aminosäurenquelle und ohne Proteinkomplexe tierischer Herkunft | ||
Former [2007/44] | Culture medium with yeast or soy bean extract as aminoacid source and no protein complexes of animal origin | ||
Former [2007/44] | Milieu de culture avec extrait d'amidon ou de soja en tant que source d'acides aminés et dépourvu de complexes protéiques d'origine animale | Examination procedure | 12.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 10.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.03.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98923023.0 / EP0983342 | Divisional application(s) | EP10002348.0 / EP2199382 | EP10176826.5 / EP2267113 | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/43] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.08.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 10.08.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 17.11.2010 | FI | 17.11.2010 | SE | 17.11.2010 | IE | 28.05.2011 | LU | 28.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2012/20] | DK | 17.11.2010 | |
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 28.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | DK | 17.11.2010 | |
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | DK | 17.11.2010 | |
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/30] | FI | 17.11.2010 | |
SE | 17.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4695624 (MARBURG STEPHEN [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0429816 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 6-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0540897 (ISTITUTO RICERCHE IMMUNOBIOLOG [IT]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * * page 2, column 1, line 1 - line 46 * * page 2, column 2, line 1 - line 29 * * examples 1,2 *; | [Y]WO9409115 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5494808 (FU JEFFREY [US]) [A] * abstract * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 9 * * column 5, line 1 - line 56 * * table 1 *; | [A] - ATCC: Bacteria nd viruses, 19th Edition, ROCKVILLE, US, ATCC, PIENTA, P., TANG, J., COTE, R., (1996), ISBN 0-930009-59-2, XP002451189 [A] * pages 71,103 * * page 108 - page 109 * * page 177 - page 178 * * page 183 * * page 249 - page 250 * * page 477 - page 479 * * pages 488,507 * | [A] - HERRIOTT R M ET AL, "DEFINED MEDIUM FOR GROWTH OF HAEMOPHILUS-INFLUENZAE", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1970), vol. 101, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 513 - 516, XP002451186 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * | [Y] - BUTLER L O, "A defined medium for Haemophilus influenzae and Haemophilus parainfluenzae.", JOURNAL OF GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY JAN 1962, (196201), vol. 27, ISSN 0022-1287, pages 51 - 60, XP008083778 [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * | [A] - KLEIN R D ET AL, "Simplified media for the growth of Haemophilus influenzae from clinical and normal flora sources", JOURNAL OF GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY 1979 UNITED KINGDOM, (1979), vol. 113, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1287, pages 409 - 411, XP008083779 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * | [A] - WOLIN H L, "Defined medium for Haemophilus influenzae type B.", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY JAN 1963, (196301), vol. 85, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 253 - 254, XP002451187 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * | [X] - VELLA P P ET AL, "Immunogenicity of a new Haemophilus influenzae type b conjugate vaccine (meningococcal protein conjugate) (PedvaxHIB).", PEDIATRICS APR 1990, (199004), vol. 85, no. 4 Pt 2, ISSN 0031-4005, pages 668 - 675, XP008083775 [X] 1-3 * the whole document * | [X] - CORBEL M J, "CONTROL TESTING OF COMBINED VACCINES: A CONSIDERATION OF POTENTIAL PROBLEMS AND APPROACHES", BIOLOGICALS, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD., LONDON, GB, (19941201), vol. 22, no. 4, ISSN 1045-1056, pages 353 - 360, XP000603003 [X] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/biol.1994.1054 | [Y] - TAHA F S ET AL, "Soybean extracts as culture media for the growth and toxin production of Corynebacterium diphtheriae", EGYPTIAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION JOURNAL, EGYPTIAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION,, EG, (1985), vol. 60, no. 1-2, ISSN 0013-2446, pages 113 - 126, XP008083774 [Y] 4-8 * the whole document * | [X] - SCHNEERSON R ET AL, "A toxoid vaccine for pertussis as well as diphtheria? Lessons to be relearned", LANCET THE, LANCET LIMITED. LONDON, GB, (19961109), vol. 348, no. 9037, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 1289 - 1292, XP004837631 [X] 6-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(96)05243-9 | by applicant | DD294502 | WO9409115 | - "Bacterial Vaccines in Advances", A. MIZRAHI, Biotechnology Processes, WILEY-LISS, (1990), vol. 13 | - "European Journal of Gastroenterology and Hepatology of Helicobacterpylori infection", RAPPUOLI, R. ET AL., Proceedings of an interdisciplinary meeting, CS CURRENT SCIENCE, (19930618), pages S76 - S78 | - RAPPUOLI, R., VACCINE, (1994), vol. 12, pages 579 - 581 | - MANETTI, R. ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1995), vol. 63, pages 4476 - 4480 | - "New and improved vaccines against Diphtheria and Tetanus", RAPPUOLI, R., New Generation of Vaccines, MARCEL DEKKER INC., (1990), pages 251 - 268 | - GUPTA, R. K. ET AL., VACCINE, (1995), vol. 13, pages 1263 - 1276 | - BLASER, M.J., J. INFECT. DIS., (1990), vol. 161, pages 629 - 633 | - PARSONNET, J., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (1991), vol. 325, pages 1127 - 1131 |