Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
29.01.2010 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.01.2010 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.07.2009 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
26.09.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
09.08.2008 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
01.04.2008 | Change: Renewal fee paid | |
01.04.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.03.2008 | First examination report | |
26.03.2008 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
18.01.2008 | Publication of search report | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
23.11.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] |
23.11.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] |
08.11.2007 | Change: Renewal fee paid | |
08.11.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |