EP1870875 - Electro-optical device, method of driving electro-optical device, and electronic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2007/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasai, Toshiyuki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Cloughley, Peter Andrew, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Cloughley, Peter Andrew, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 07075846.1 | 08.12.2003 | [2007/52] | Priority number, date | JP20020360978 | 12.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002360978 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1870875 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1870875 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
G09G3/3241 (EP,US);
G09G3/30 (KR);
G09G3/2011 (EP,US);
G09G3/3233 (EP,US);
G09G3/325 (EP,US);
G09G3/3258 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0819 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0842 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0852 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0861 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0262 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0238 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0247 (EP,US);
G09G2320/043 (EP,US);
G09G3/2018 (EP,US);
G09G3/2081 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/52] | Title | German: | Elektrooptische Vorrichtung, Verfahren zur Ansteuerung einer elektrooptischen Vorrichtung und elektronisches Gerät | [2007/52] | English: | Electro-optical device, method of driving electro-optical device, and electronic apparatus | [2007/52] | French: | Dispositif électrooptique, méthode de commande d'un dispositif électro-optique et appareil électronique | [2007/52] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 28.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 08.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03257710.8 / EP1429312 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1061497 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0040] , [0048]; figures 1,5 *; | [A]EP1091341 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0022] , [0036]; figures 6A-6D *; | [A]US2002015104 (ITOH GOH [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0077] , [0080] - [0082]; figure 8 *; | [A]US2002130828 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0142] , [0143]; figures 1,2 * |