EP1923636 - Device for injecting a mix of air and fuel, combustion chamber and turbomachine equipped with such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNECMA 2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2008/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sandelis, Denis Jean Maurice 1, rue André Dubois 77370 Nangis / FR | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/14] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2011/11] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2008/21] | Nguyen, Dominique Snecma Département Propriété Intellectuelle - WRS/DJIB 77550 Moissy Cramayel / FR | Application number, filing date | 07075978.2 | 13.11.2007 | [2008/21] | Priority number, date | FR20060010012 | 16.11.2006 Original published format: FR 0610012 | [2008/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1923636 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1923636 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/14 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
F23R3/14 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03041 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03042 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03044 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2016/14] |
Former [2009/05] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einspritzen einer Mischung aus Luft und Treibstoff, Brennkammer und Strömungsmaschine, die mit einer solchen Vorrichtung ausgestattet ist | [2008/21] | English: | Device for injecting a mix of air and fuel, combustion chamber and turbomachine equipped with such a device | [2008/21] | French: | Dispositif d'injection d'un mélange d'air et de carburant, chambre de combustion et turbomachine munies d'un tel dispositif | [2008/21] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 11.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5129231 (BECKER JAMES T [US], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * column 3, line 20 - line 40 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5329761 (ABLETT ADRIAN M [US], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * column 4, line 52 - column 6, line 68; figure 3 *; | [DA]FR2753779 (SNECMA [FR]) [DA] 1,6,7 * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 21 ** figure 1 *; | [A]US5956955 (SCHMID ACHIM [DE]) [A] 1,6,7 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 22 * * column 3, line 15 - line 53 * * figures 1,4 * | by applicant | FR2753779 |