EP1808345 - Windshield wiper device for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/13] |
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH C/IPE Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Metz, Ulrich Kirchwegstr. 48 77855 Achern / DE | [2007/29] | Application number, filing date | 07100008.7 | 02.01.2007 | [2007/29] | Priority number, date | DE20061001963 | 13.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006001963 | DE20061015220 | 30.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006015220 | [2007/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1808345 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1808345 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1808345 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/04 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
B60S1/0433 (EP);
B60S1/0441 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/29] | Title | German: | Scheibenwischvorrichtung für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2007/29] | English: | Windshield wiper device for a motor vehicle | [2007/29] | French: | Dispositif d'essuie-glace de véhicule automobile | [2007/29] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 13.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.06.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 26.06.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.03.2010 | CZ | 31.03.2010 | DK | 31.03.2010 | EE | 31.03.2010 | FI | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | HU | 31.03.2010 | IE | 31.03.2010 | IT | 31.03.2010 | LT | 31.03.2010 | LV | 31.03.2010 | NL | 31.03.2010 | RO | 31.03.2010 | SE | 31.03.2010 | SI | 31.03.2010 | SK | 31.03.2010 | TR | 31.03.2010 | BG | 30.06.2010 | ES | 12.07.2010 | IS | 31.07.2010 | PT | 02.08.2010 | LU | 02.01.2011 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/45] | CY | 31.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
HU | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
LU | 02.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 31.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
LU | 02.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 31.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
LU | 02.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 31.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
LU | 02.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 31.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CY | 31.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 31.03.2010 | |
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | FI | 31.03.2010 | |
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3116821 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 10, paragraph L - page 11, paragraph 1; figures 4-6 *; | [DX]DE19809630 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [DX] 1 * column 1, line 17 - line 20; figure - *; | [A]WO0204263 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [A]EP1270350 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1* column 5, paragraph 23; figure - * | by applicant | DE19809630 |