EP1806753 - Device for stabilizing a steam dryer assembly in a nuclear reactor pressure vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/28] | Method and device for stabilizing a steam dryer assembly in a nuclear reactor pressure vessel | ||
[2011/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2012/11] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erbes, John 1330 Isabelle Avenue Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 02 /
Drendel, David Bryan 6286 Mahan Drive San Jose, CA 95123 / US | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Gray, Thomas GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Gray, Thomas GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2009/36] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/28] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE - London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07100065.7 | 03.01.2007 | [2007/28] | Priority number, date | US20060325651 | 04.01.2006 Original published format: US 325651 | [2007/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1806753 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1806753 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1806753 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G21C5/10, G21C15/16 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
G21C15/16 (EP,US);
G21C5/10 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/28] | G21C15/16 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FI, LI, SE [2010/46] |
Former [2007/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Stabilisieren eines Dampftrockners in einem Kernreaktordruckgefäss | [2011/32] | English: | Device for stabilizing a steam dryer assembly in a nuclear reactor pressure vessel | [2011/32] | French: | Dispositif pour stabiliser un sécheur de vapeur dans une cuve de pression d'un réacteur nucléaire | [2011/32] |
Former [2007/28] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Stabilisieren eines Dampftrockners in einem Kernreaktordruckgefäss | ||
Former [2007/28] | Method and device for stabilizing a steam dryer assembly in a nuclear reactor pressure vessel | ||
Former [2007/28] | Méthode et dispositif pour stabiliser un sécheur de vapeur dans une cuve de pression d'un réacteur nucléaire | Examination procedure | 10.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 11.09.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 14.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3503373 (SOKOLOWSKI PETER F) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, lines 11-47 * * column 2, lines 33-39,59-72 ** column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 24 *; | [A]US3793142 (GUNNARSSON C) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * figures 1-6,8 * * column 1, lines 6-10 * * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 14 * * column 4, lines 11-37 *; | [XI]US4345549 (COLMANO RICCARDO) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1,2,8 * * column 1, lines 6-18 * * column 3, lines 31-44 * * column 4, lines 14-25 * * column 6, lines 39-59 * [I] 4-6 |