EP1873541 - Enhanced-accuracy battery capacity prediction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jung Hwan 207-1213, Wooseong Apt., Sadang2-dong Dongjack-gu Seoul / KR | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/01] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07100291.9 | 09.01.2007 | [2008/01] | Priority number, date | KR20060058764 | 28.06.2006 Original published format: KR 20060058764 | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1873541 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
G01R31/3648 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [2008/37] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Präzisere Batterieleistungsprognose | [2008/01] | English: | Enhanced-accuracy battery capacity prediction | [2008/01] | French: | Prédiction de la capacité de batterie amélioré | [2008/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 03.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 07.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0583906 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10* page 4, line 22 - page 4, line 31; figure 4; claims 6,7 *; | [X]US6087808 (PRITCHARD JEFFREY A [US]) [X] 1-6,8 * figure 4 *; | [X]US6529840 (HING SOTHUN [FR]) [X] 1,4,8 * column 2, line 26 - column 2, line 62; figure 2 *; | [X]US2004160224 (YAMAZAKI KAZUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8 * paragraphs [0067] , [0068] , [0089] , [0093]; figures 16,17 * | Examination | US6057688 | by applicant | US2004160224 |