EP1808109 - Container for fluids to be heated [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I.R.C.A. S.p.a. Industria Resistenze Corazzate e Affini Viale Venezia 31 31020 San Vendemiano / IT | [2007/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Virzi, Andrea I.R.C.A. S.p.A.-Ind. Res. Cor. e Af Viale Venezia, 31 31020, San Vendemiano / IT | 02 /
Capraro, Duilio I.R.C.A. S.p.A.-Ind. Res. Cor. e Viale Venezia, 31 31020, San Vendemiano / IT | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Piovesana, Paolo c/o Praxi Intellectual Property S.p.A.- Venezia Via Francesco Baracca, 5/A 30173 Venezia-Mestre / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | Piovesana, Paolo Via F. Baracca, 5/a 30173 Venezia-Mestre / IT | Application number, filing date | 07100380.0 | 11.01.2007 | [2007/29] | Priority number, date | IT2006VE00001U | 12.01.2006 Original published format: IT VE20060001 U | [2007/29] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1808109 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1808109 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/21 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
A47J27/21041 (EP);
A47J37/1261 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/25] |
Former [2007/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Behälter für zu erwärmende Flüssigkeiten | [2007/29] | English: | Container for fluids to be heated | [2007/29] | French: | Récipient pour fluides à chauffer | [2007/29] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/42] | 26.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1013207 (MOULINEX SA [FR]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0011] - [0023]; figure - *; | [A]WO02085169 (STRIX LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-5* page 11, line 35 - page 18, line 2; figure - *; | [A]FR2846509 (SEB SA [FR]) [A] 1-5 * page 14, line 25 - page 17, line 32; figure - *; | [X]WO2005092159 (STRIX LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 5, line 33 - page 8, line 10; figures 1,3 *; | [PX]EP1649792 (STRIX LTD [GB]) [PX] 1,4 * paragraphs [0032] - [0045]; figure - * |