EP1775842 - Communications device and wireless communications system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Obuchi, Kazuhisa c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Miyazaki, Shunji c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Yano, Tetsuya c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07100595.3 | 07.04.2005 | [2007/16] | Priority number, date | JP20040213093 | 21.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004213093 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1775842 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1775842 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/29 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
H04L1/005 (EP,US);
H03M13/37 (KR);
H03M13/2771 (EP,US);
H03M13/2957 (EP,US);
H03M13/2975 (EP,US);
H04L1/0041 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | [2011/12] |
Former [2007/16] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Kommunikationsgerät und drahtloses Kommunikationssystem | [2007/16] | English: | Communications device and wireless communications system | [2007/16] | French: | Dispositif de communication et système de communications sans fil | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/29] | 22.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/29] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05252188.7 / EP1619802 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050252188) is 16.06.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JP2000201085 (NTT MOBIL COMM NETWORK INC) [XD] 12 * the whole document * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2002166095 (LAVI YOAV [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003028838 (CHANG HYOKANG [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US6539512 (JEONG JONG-SIK [KR], et al) [A] 12 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 35 *; | [X]US2004061964 (AKAMATSU MANABU [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 45 - page 4, paragraph 69; figure 1 *; | [X] - Lei Cao; Daigle, J.; Chang Wen Chen; Matalgah, M.;, "Complexity reduced turbo decoding with concatenated detection codes", Piscataway, NJ, USA, vol. 1, (20031009), pages 678 - 681, Vehicular Technology Conference, 2003. VTC 2003-Fall. 2003 IEEE 58th, Proceedings on, (20100526), XP002584528 [X] 1-15 * page 680 * | [AP] - KABATIANSKY, G., KROUK, E., SEMENOV, S., Error Correcting Coding and Security for Data Networks, Chichester, England, John Wiley and Sons, Ltd, (20050101), pages 176 - 183, ISBN 047086754X, XP002584416 [AP] 1-15 * page 178 * | [A] - Zheng Ma; Wai Ho Mow; Pingzhi Fan;, "On reducing the average complexity of Turbo decoding with application to W-CDMA", Piscataway, NJ, USA, vol. 1, (20030910), pages 297 - 300, Personal, Indoor and Mobile Radio Communications, 2003. PIMRC 2003. 14th IEEE Proceedings on, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/stamp/stamp.jsp?arnumber=01264281, (20100526), XP002584529 [A] 1-14 * page 298 * |