EP1815986 - Label printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gallus Ferd. Rüesch AG Harzbüchelstrasse 34 9016 St. Gallen / CH | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bachofen, Andreas / Seebühlstr. 12B 8472, Seuzach / CH | 02 /
Fenner, Peter / Bahnhofstr. 15 8852, Altendorf / CH | 03 /
Herzig, Kurt / Libellenweg 5 9244, Niederuzwil / CH | [2012/47] |
Former [2007/32] | 01 /
Bachofen, Andreas Seebühlstr. 12B 8472, Seuzach / CH | ||
02 /
Fenner, Peter Bahnhofstr. 15 8852, Altendorf / CH | |||
03 /
Herzig, Kurt Libellenweg 5 9244, Niederuzwil / CH | Representative(s) | Franzen, Peter, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Intellectual Property Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | Franzen, Peter, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Intellectual Property Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2012/47] | Fey, Hans-Jürgen Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung Postfach 10 29 40 69019 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | Fey, Hans-Jürgen Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung Postfach 10 29 40 69019 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2007/32] | Szymanowski, Carsten Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Intellectual Property Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07100866.8 | 22.01.2007 | [2007/32] | Priority number, date | DE20061003554 | 25.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006003554 | [2007/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1815986 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1815986 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1815986 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/00, B41F33/02, B41F31/04, B41F19/00 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
B41F33/02 (EP);
B41F19/00 (EP);
B41F31/045 (EP);
B41F33/0036 (EP);
B41P2217/11 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/32] | B41F33/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Title | German: | Etikettendruckmaschine | [2007/32] | English: | Label printing press | [2007/32] | French: | Machine d'impression d'étiquettes | [2007/32] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 28.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.01.2007 | CY | 21.11.2012 | CZ | 21.11.2012 | EE | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | IS | 21.11.2012 | LT | 21.11.2012 | LV | 21.11.2012 | PL | 21.11.2012 | RO | 21.11.2012 | SE | 21.11.2012 | SI | 21.11.2012 | SK | 21.11.2012 | TR | 21.11.2012 | AT | 22.01.2013 | IE | 22.01.2013 | LU | 22.01.2013 | BE | 31.01.2013 | FR | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | BG | 21.02.2013 | GB | 21.02.2013 | GR | 22.02.2013 | ES | 04.03.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 22.01.2007 | |
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
AT | 22.01.2013 | ||
IE | 22.01.2013 | ||
LU | 22.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GB | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 21.11.2012 | |
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
AT | 22.01.2013 | ||
IE | 22.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GB | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 21.11.2012 | |
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
AT | 22.01.2013 | ||
IE | 22.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GB | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
AT | 22.01.2013 | ||
IE | 22.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GB | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
IE | 22.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GB | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
IE | 22.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 21.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0243811 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [A] 1-17 * figure 1 ** column 1, line 31 - column 2, line 4 *; | [A]WO9529813 (NILPETER AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-17 * figure 1 * * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 18 *; | [Y]EP0864421 (MULTI PRINT SYSTEMS B V [NL]) [Y] 2,3,6-8 * figures 1-10 * * column 4, lines 6-38 *; | [Y]WO02087885 (BAVARIA DIGITAL TECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 10,12,14-16 * figures 3,4 * * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 3 *; | [Y]EP1273445 (WIFAG MASCHF [CH]) [Y] 13 * figure 1 * * abstract *; | [IY]WO2004096546 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE], et al) [I] 1,4,5,9,11,17 * figure 1 * * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 4 * * page 12, paragraph 1 * [Y] 2,3,6-8,10,12-16 |