EP1816700 - Method for determining the system temperature in an electro chemical battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosenmayr, Dr. Marc 401 Pacific St. Plymouth, MI, 48170 / US | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Downar, Michael Hella Corporate Center GmbH HCC/CPL Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | Downar, Michael Hella Corporate Center GmbH HCC/CPL Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 07100970.8 | 23.01.2007 | [2007/32] | Priority number, date | DE20061004786 | 02.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006004786 | [2007/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1816700 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/44, H01M10/48 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
H01M10/486 (EP,US);
H01M2200/108 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/16] |
Former [2007/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung einer Systemtemperatur einer elektrochemischen Batterie | [2007/32] | English: | Method for determining the system temperature in an electro chemical battery | [2007/32] | French: | Procédé destiné à la détermination de la température du système d'une batterie électrochimique | [2007/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/36] | 26.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004155661 (FIELD ROBERT B [CA], et al) [X] 1-10 * figures 1,4,6; claims 1,6-8,12,14 *; | [X] - ENERGY CONVERSION AND MANAGEMENT, (2004), vol. 45, page 1015-1041, XP002435781 [X] 1-10 * page 1024, line 7 - page 1026; figure 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.enconman.2003.08.014 | [X] - CETC-CANMET ENERGY TECHNOLOGY CENTRE, (20020409), no. 2002-049, XP002435782 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [03.6] * | [Y] - J. ELECTROCHEM.SOCIETY, (2000), vol. 147, no. 8, pages 2910 - 2922, XP002435783 [Y] 1-10 * page 2910, column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 13; figures 1,3,10 * * page 2917, column 1, lines 1-22 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1393625 | [Y] - "HERSTELLERÜBERGREIFENDE ENERGIEMANAGEMENT-LÖSUNG: INTELLIGENTER BATTERIESENSOR", AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRONICS + SYSTEMS, CARL HANSER VERLAG MÜNCHEN, (2004), pages 26 - 29, XP002435784 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * | [T] - ANONYMOUS, "Battery Modeling", INTERNET ARTICLE, URL: www.thermoanalytics.com/support/publications/batterymodelsdoc.html, (20070529), XP002435785 [T] 1-10 |