EP1949796 - Mousse [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mor, Aline, Lucena 51 Whitecross Gardens YORK YO31 8JH / GB | 02 /
Oton Sanchez, Eugenia Eppendorfer Landstrasse 102A DE- 20249 HAMBOURG / DE | 03 /
Fiaux, Thierry, D. 76 Bishopthorpe Road YORK YO231 JS / GB | 04 /
Ruet, Delphine Claude Nestlé España SA Fabrica Penilla Calle Valdenoja, 52 - 4[deg]B 39012 Santander (Cantabria) / ES | 05 /
Hargreaves, Jeremy, Micheal 46 rue de la Gare 1820 Montreux / CH | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2009/47] |
Former [2008/31] | Rauline, Mathilde Nestec S.A. Intellectual Property Department 55, Avenue Nestlé CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 07101146.4 | 25.01.2007 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1949796 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/00, A23G1/52, A23P1/08, A23P1/16 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
A23P30/40 (EP,US);
A21D13/38 (EP,US);
A23G1/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Title | German: | Schaumspeise | [2008/31] | English: | Mousse | [2008/31] | French: | Mousse | [2008/31] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/20] | 29.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2004105031 ; | [A]US4818554 (GIDDEY CLAUDE [CH], et al) [A] 1-24 * example 1 *; | [A]US5962059 (PERNIN JACQUES [CH], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 3, line 15 - line 30; example 1 *; | [A]WO02071861 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-21* figures 8,9 *; | [A]WO2006067064 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 4, line 1 - line 5; claim 1 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 27, Database accession no. 2004-289503, XP002439073 & JP2004105031 A 20040408 (LOTTE CHILSUNG BEVERAGE CO LTD) [X] 1,9,11,16 * abstract * |