EP1837206 - Pneumatic tyres for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Reifen Deutschland GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2010/02] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Christian / Steinwartskamp 69 30826 Garbsen / DE | 02 /
Kleffmann, Jens Rothermundstrasse 24a 30165 Hannover / DE | 03 /
Kramer, Thomas / Zum Johannisbruch 32 31832 Springe / DE | 04 /
Haufe, Matthias Moorbachweg 5a 31535 Neustadt / DE | [2013/17] |
Former [2007/39] | 01 /
Weber, Christian Steinwartskamp 69 30826 Garbsen / DE | ||
02 /
Kleffmann, Jens Rothermundstrasse 24a 30165 Hannover / DE | |||
03 /
Kramer, Thomas Zum Johannisbruch 32 31832 Springe / DE | |||
04 /
Haufe, Matthias Moorbachweg 5a 31535 Neustadt / DE | Representative(s) | Finger, Karsten, et al Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Finger, Karsten, et al Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 1 69 30001 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 07101287.6 | 29.01.2007 | [2007/39] | Priority number, date | DE20061012536 | 18.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006012536 | [2007/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1837206 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1837206 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/00 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
B60C11/00 (EP);
B60C11/005 (EP);
B60C11/0075 (EP);
B60C2011/0025 (EP);
B60C2200/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugluftreifen | [2007/39] | English: | Pneumatic tyres for a vehicle | [2007/39] | French: | Pneumatique de véhicule | [2007/39] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.01.2007 | CY | 24.04.2013 | CZ | 24.04.2013 | DK | 24.04.2013 | EE | 24.04.2013 | FI | 24.04.2013 | IT | 24.04.2013 | LT | 24.04.2013 | LV | 24.04.2013 | MC | 24.04.2013 | PL | 24.04.2013 | RO | 24.04.2013 | SE | 24.04.2013 | SI | 24.04.2013 | SK | 24.04.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.07.2013 | IS | 24.08.2013 | PT | 26.08.2013 | [2016/32] |
Former [2014/38] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 24.04.2013 | |
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 24.04.2013 | |
PT | 26.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1016555 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0017] - [0021]; figure 1; claim - *; | [Y]JP2000326706 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US2002036041 (SUZUKI KAZUYA [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document * |