EP1818183 - Motor vehicle wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stefanello, Marilena Vicolo Torricelli 1 35010 Vigonza PD / IT | [2007/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zanin, Andrea Via Antonio Bevilacqua, 111 Villanova di Camposampiero PD 35010 / IT | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/33] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07101419.5 | 30.01.2007 | [2007/33] | Priority number, date | IT2006PD00016U | 07.02.2006 Original published format: IT PD20060016 U | [2007/43] |
Former [2007/33] | IT2006PD00016 | 07.02.2006 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1818183 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60B7/14 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
B60B7/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/33] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugrad | [2007/33] | English: | Motor vehicle wheel | [2007/33] | French: | Roue d'une véhicule à moteur | [2007/33] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 16.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5443582 (CHING SHEU L [TW]) [Y] 1,2,8,12,13,16 * figures 1-3; claims 1,4 *; | [A]US5577809 (CHASE LEE A [US]) [A] 1,2,4,12,13,16 * column 6, line 61 - line 37; figures 1,3-5 ** column 9, line 7 - line 28 *; | [XA]US6068350 (BAUMGARTEN JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11,16 * column 2, line 42 - column 6, line 67; figures 3,7; claims 1,3,8,9,16 * [A] 4-8,10; | [YA]WO2004028832 (THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,8,12,13,16 * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 2; figures 1,2; claims 1,4,6,7,9 * [A] 9,10,14 |