EP1832417 - Processing machine with at least a driving unit with at least drive controller controlled by a motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seyfried, Rüdiger Am Hoffeld 28 97265, Hettstadt / DE | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Stiel, Jürgen Koenig & Bauer AG Lizenzen - Patente Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Stiel, Jürgen Koenig & Bauer AG Lizenzen - Patente Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | Stiel, Jürgen Koenig & Bauer AG, Lizenzen - Patente, Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07101537.4 | 01.02.2007 | [2007/37] | Priority number, date | DE20061011201 | 10.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006011201 | [2007/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1832417 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1832417 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1832417 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/004, B41F33/00, B41F33/14, B41F33/16, B41F33/18, G05B19/00 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
B41F33/14 (EP);
B41F33/00 (EP);
B41F33/16 (EP);
B41F33/18 (EP);
G05B19/048 (EP);
B41P2213/70 (EP);
B41P2233/20 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/37] | B41F13/004, B41F33/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Title | German: | Bearbeitungsmaschinen mit mindestens einer Antriebseinheit mit einem zumindest einen Motor regelnden Antriebsregler | [2007/37] | English: | Processing machine with at least a driving unit with at least drive controller controlled by a motor | [2007/37] | French: | Machine de traitement avec au moins une unité d'entrainement avec au moins un régulateur d'entrainement regulé par un motéur | [2007/37] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 12.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2007 | BG | 09.10.2013 | CY | 09.10.2013 | CZ | 09.10.2013 | DK | 09.10.2013 | EE | 09.10.2013 | ES | 09.10.2013 | FI | 09.10.2013 | LT | 09.10.2013 | LV | 09.10.2013 | MC | 09.10.2013 | NL | 09.10.2013 | PL | 09.10.2013 | RO | 09.10.2013 | SE | 09.10.2013 | SI | 09.10.2013 | SK | 09.10.2013 | TR | 09.10.2013 | GR | 10.01.2014 | AT | 01.02.2014 | IE | 01.02.2014 | LU | 01.02.2014 | IS | 09.02.2014 | PT | 10.02.2014 | BE | 28.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 01.02.2007 | |
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
AT | 01.02.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 09.10.2013 | |
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
AT | 01.02.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 09.10.2013 | |
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
AT | 01.02.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
AT | 01.02.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IE | 01.02.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IE | 01.02.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
LU | 01.02.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | ES | 09.10.2013 | |
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 09.10.2013 | |
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 09.10.2013 | |
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 09.10.2013 | |
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 09.10.2013 | |
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 09.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0068482 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,6,7 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * abstract *; | [A]FR2620380 (WIFAG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1,4,8,17-21,25 * page 1, lines 1-10 * * page 2, lines 10-22 * * page 4, lines 11-12 * * page 7, lines 6-12,31-34 * * page 6, line 31 * * page 8, lines 2-7 * * page 9, lines 1-6 * * page 12, line 10 *; | [XA]DE20000919U (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 4,5 * page 3, paragraph 6 * * page 4, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 5, paragraphs 2,3; claim 1 * [A] 25; | [XYI]DE10129889 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [X] 4-6 * column 7, lines 12-18, paragraph 41 * * column 15, line 25, paragraph 38 * * paragraphs [0020] , [0023] - [0026] - [0038] * [Y] 17-21,25,29,31,32,34 [I] 1-3,7; | [YA]DE10052046 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [Y] 17-21,25,29,31,32,34 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0008] , [0014] , [0015] , [0018]; claim 1 * [A] 1,4; | [XYI]US2002131454 (FRANKE MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 4,5 * paragraphs [0002] , [0025] , [0029] * * paragraph [0024] * [Y] 17-21 [I] 1-3,6; | [XY]US6456222 (AGNE WERNER [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0010] , [0013] , [0015] , [0018] , [0019] * [Y] 2-7,17-21,25; | [A]US2003109947 (SCHERER JOHANN [DE], et al) [A] 19,25 * paragraphs [0009] , [0011] , [0015] , [0052] , [0089] , [0091] , [0092] *; | [Y]EP1388769 (RENNER PETER [DE]) [Y] 2-7,17-21,25 * paragraphs [0002] , [0022] , [0023] , [0024] , [0025] , [0031] - [0034] - [0037] , [0046] *; | [XI]DE10317570 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [X] 1-8,17-19 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0012] , [0013] , [0026] , [0029] , [0033] , [0037] , [0047] , [0053] , [0055] , [0034] , [0064]; claims 6,7,11 * [I] 9,20,21,25; | [A]US6891838 (PETITE THOMAS D [US], et al) [A] 25* paragraphs [0016] , [0019] , [0020] , [0055] , [0073] * | by applicant | JPS62278037 | US4966074 | DE10129889 | US6456222 | EP1375140 | DE10317570 |