EP1953001 - Cam system for bookbinding sewing machines with different biasing of a single follower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MECCANOTECNICA S.p.A. Via B. Maffeis, 4 I-24025 Gazzaniga - Bergamo / IT | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fustinoni, Roberto Via Malogno, 48 I-25036, PALAZZOLO / IT | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Pezzoli, Ennio c/o Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l. Via Settembrini 40 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Pezzoli, Ennio c/o Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l. Via Settembrini 40 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2008/32] | Pezzoli, Ennio Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l. Via Settembrini 40 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07101578.8 | 01.02.2007 | [2008/32] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1953001 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1953001 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B42B2/02, F16H25/16 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
F16H25/16 (EP);
B42B2/04 (EP);
F16H53/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [2009/16] |
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Nockensystem für Buchbinde-Heftmaschinen mit unterschiedlicher Ausrichtung eines einzelnen Stössels | [2008/32] | English: | Cam system for bookbinding sewing machines with different biasing of a single follower | [2008/32] | French: | Système à came pour machines à relier avec inclinaison différente d'un levier entraîné unique | [2008/32] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 07.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB789111 (SMYTH MFG CO) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]GB1225679 (SCHNELLPRESSENFABRIK FRANKENTHAL ALBERT & CIE A.G.) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |