Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7826984 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2010 | B2 | US2008255772 | 16.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07101800 | 06.02.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1955830 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2014 | B1 | EP1955830 | 13.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07101800 | 06.02.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101241359 | 13.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07101800 | 06.02.2007 |