EP1832534 - Gripper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2017 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FPS Food Processing Systems B.V. Burg. G.J.F. Tijdemanstraat 13 2631 RE Nootdorp / NL | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doppenberg, Gerrit Schoonhoverweg 7 3881ST Putten / NL | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2007/37] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07102111.7 | 09.02.2007 | [2007/37] | Priority number, date | EP20060075519 | 06.03.2006 Original published format: EP 06075519 | [2007/37] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1832534 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1832534 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/90 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
B65G47/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Title | German: | Greifer | [2007/37] | English: | Gripper | [2007/37] | French: | Dispositif de préhension | [2007/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 25.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.09.2009 | BE | 09.09.2009 | BG | 09.09.2009 | CY | 09.09.2009 | CZ | 09.09.2009 | EE | 09.09.2009 | FI | 09.09.2009 | LT | 09.09.2009 | LV | 09.09.2009 | RO | 09.09.2009 | SE | 09.09.2009 | SI | 09.09.2009 | SK | 09.09.2009 | TR | 09.09.2009 | GR | 10.12.2009 | IS | 09.01.2010 | PT | 11.01.2010 | IE | 09.02.2010 | LU | 09.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | HU | 10.03.2010 | [2017/31] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
BG | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
TR | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
IE | 09.02.2010 | ||
LU | 09.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
BG | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
IE | 09.02.2010 | ||
LU | 09.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
BG | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
IE | 09.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
BG | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
IE | 09.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
IE | 09.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
IE | 09.02.2010 | ||
IT | 09.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2743954 (BERTIL OSTLUND KARL) [A] 1 * column 1, line 56 - column 5, line 17 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]SU1615134 (SP KT BYURO GLAVMOSINZHSTROYA [SU]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]NL9101951 (JAN CORNELIS KREMER) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US5338150 (FOCKE HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |