EP1832492 - Rail vehicle equipped with a drainage system for the door area [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carls, Franz-Josef Karl-Marx-Straße 30 34233, Fuldatal / DE | [2007/37] | Application number, filing date | 07102268.5 | 13.02.2007 | [2007/37] | Priority number, date | DE20061011024 | 09.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006011024 | [2007/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1832492 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1832492 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1832492 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B61D49/00, B61D19/00, B61D1/00 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
B61D1/00 (EP);
B61D19/00 (EP);
B61D49/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Title | German: | Schienenfahrzeug, ausgestattet mit einem Entwässerungssystem für einen Einstiegsbereich | [2007/37] | English: | Rail vehicle equipped with a drainage system for the door area | [2007/37] | French: | Véhicule ferroviaire équipé d'un système de drainage pour la plateforme d'accès | [2007/37] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 16.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.08.2009 | CZ | 19.08.2009 | DK | 19.08.2009 | EE | 19.08.2009 | FI | 19.08.2009 | IE | 19.08.2009 | IT | 19.08.2009 | LT | 19.08.2009 | LV | 19.08.2009 | NL | 19.08.2009 | PL | 19.08.2009 | RO | 19.08.2009 | SE | 19.08.2009 | SI | 19.08.2009 | SK | 19.08.2009 | TR | 19.08.2009 | BG | 19.11.2009 | GR | 20.11.2009 | ES | 30.11.2009 | IS | 19.12.2009 | PT | 21.12.2009 | LU | 13.02.2010 | HU | 20.02.2010 | BE | 28.02.2010 | FR | 01.03.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
IT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
LU | 13.02.2010 | ||
HU | 20.02.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
IT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
HU | 20.02.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
IT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2108137 (OFTEDAL PHILIP R, et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2613406 (DEAN ALBERT G) [A] 1 * figure 9 *; | [A]US3768422 (SHAVER W, et al) [A] 1 * figures 2-4 *; | [A]US4867073 (DUGGE RICHARD H [US]) [A] 1* figure 3 *; | [A]DE102004043577 (HUEBNER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 * |