EP1780722 - Write-once-type recording medium, recording apparatus and method for write-once-type recording medium, and reproducing apparatus and method for write-once-type recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | ||
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Masayoshi c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works, 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359-8522 / JP | 02 /
Koda, Takeshi c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works, 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359-8522 / JP | 03 /
Imamura, Akira c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works, 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359-8522 / JP | [2012/04] |
Former [2007/18] | 01 /
Yoshida, Masayoshi c/0 Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works, 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359-8522 / JP | ||
02 /
Koda, Takeshi c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works, 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359-8522 / JP | |||
03 /
Imamura, Akira c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works, 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359-8522 / JP | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07102406.1 | 17.03.2004 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | JP20030072771 | 17.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003072771 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1780722 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1780722 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | [2010/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1780722 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/18, G11B20/10 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
G11C29/72 (EP,US);
G11B20/12 (KR);
G11B20/10 (EP,KR,US);
G11B20/1883 (EP,US);
G11B7/00375 (EP,US);
G11B7/007 (KR);
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1873 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/218 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/18] | G11B20/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Title | German: | Einmalig beschreibbares Aufzeichnungsmedium, Aufzeichnungsvorrichtung und -verfahren für das einmalig beschreibbare Aufzeichnungsmedium sowie Wiedergabevorrichtung und -verfahren für das einmalig beschreibbare Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2007/18] | English: | Write-once-type recording medium, recording apparatus and method for write-once-type recording medium, and reproducing apparatus and method for write-once-type recording medium | [2007/18] | French: | Support d'enregistrement de type non réinscriptible, appareil et procédé d'enregistrement pour support d'enregistrement de type non réinscriptible et appareil et procédé de reproduction pour support d'enregistrement de type non réinscriptible | [2007/18] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 12.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04721327.7 / EP1607969 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040721327) is 14.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2004 | AT | 25.01.2012 | BE | 25.01.2012 | CY | 25.01.2012 | CZ | 25.01.2012 | DK | 25.01.2012 | EE | 25.01.2012 | FI | 25.01.2012 | IT | 25.01.2012 | NL | 25.01.2012 | PL | 25.01.2012 | RO | 25.01.2012 | SE | 25.01.2012 | SI | 25.01.2012 | SK | 25.01.2012 | TR | 25.01.2012 | IE | 17.03.2012 | LU | 17.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | BG | 25.04.2012 | GR | 26.04.2012 | ES | 06.05.2012 | PT | 25.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 17.03.2012 | ||
LU | 17.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 17.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 17.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 17.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 25.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8400628 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0350920 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5065388 (ROTH RUDOLF [NL], et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]US5068842 (NAITO RYUUICH [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0997904 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0081]; figures 3-6 *; | [A]US6160778 (ITO MOTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0122416 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-6 * page 8, line 22 - page 9, line 4 * * page 18, line 27 - page 20, line 22; figures 15,16 *; | [AD]US6469978 (OHATA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2004081922 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [E] 1,2,4,6 * page 8, line 9 - line 19 * * page 17, lines 7-17; figures 3-13 * |