EP1830054 - Method for optimizing fuel consumption in a machine powered by an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Thomas 13930 S Avenue Dike, IA 50624 / US | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Straße 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Straße 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Löser, Iris Deere & Company European Office Patent Department Steubenstraße 36-42 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07102441.8 | 15.02.2007 | [2007/36] | Priority number, date | US20060358301 | 20.02.2006 Original published format: US 358301 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1830054 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1830054 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F02D31/00, F02D41/02, F02D41/14, F02D41/30, B60W10/00 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
F02D31/007 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/11 (EP,US);
B60W30/1882 (EP,US);
F02D41/0215 (EP,US);
F02D41/1497 (EP,US);
F02D41/2429 (EP,US);
F02D41/2451 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/221 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0625 (EP,US);
F02D2250/22 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US);
Y02T10/84 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2015/14] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Optimieren des Kraftstoffverbrauchs einer von einem Verbrennungsmotor angetriebenen Maschine | [2007/36] | English: | Method for optimizing fuel consumption in a machine powered by an internal combustion engine | [2007/36] | French: | Procédé pour l'optimisation de la consommation de carburant d'une machine à moteur à combustion interne | [2007/36] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/14] | 21.02.2015 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.03.2015 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 31.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US6387011 (BELLINGER STEVEN M [US]) [AD] 1-20 * abstract ** column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 36 *; | [X]US2002123836 (KOMIYAMA SUSUMU [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0043] *; | [X]EP1411232 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] * * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] * * paragraphs [0015] - [0021] *; | [X]WO2005093238 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 28 * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 17 * |