02.11.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
30.07.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.03.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.02.2018 |
First examination report |
|
22.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2015 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
31.03.2015 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.03.2015 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] |
03.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.02.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
27.02.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
29.01.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.07.2014 |
Publication of search report |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
18.07.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
18.07.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
28.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.08.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
24.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.08.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |