EP1830070 - Motor compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuovo Pignone S.p.A. 2, Via Felice Matteucci 50127 Florence / IT | [2013/45] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Nuovo Pignone S.P.A. 2, Via Felice Matteucci 50127 Florence / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frosini, Franco Via G. Mameli 16, Sesto Fiorentino 50019, Florence / IT | 02 /
Camatti, Massimo Via Loreto 36, Casalguidi 50134, Pistoia / IT | 03 /
Rossi, Eugenio Via IV Novembre, 4, Viareggio 55049, Lucca / IT | 04 /
Vannini, Guiseppe Via Patrarca 8, Montecatini Terme 51016, Pistoia / IT | 05 /
Tasselli, Sabrina Via Ginepraia 118, Poggio a Caiano 59016, Prato / IT | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2013/45] |
Former [2008/38] | Bedford, Grant Richard GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Bedford, Grant Richard London Patent Operation GE International Inc 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07102451.7 | 15.02.2007 | [2007/36] | Priority number, date | IT2006MI00294 | 17.02.2006 Original published format: IT MI20060294 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1830070 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1830070 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | [2010/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1830070 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F04D25/06, F04D29/04, F04D29/60, F04D29/62, F04D29/058, F04D29/054, F16C37/00, F04D29/05 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
F16C37/005 (EP,US);
F04D25/0686 (EP,US);
F04D29/05 (EP,US);
F04D29/054 (EP,US);
F04D29/058 (EP,US);
F04D29/601 (EP,US);
F04D29/624 (EP,US);
F16C32/047 (EP,US);
F16C2326/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/35] | F04D25/06, F04D29/04, F04D29/60, F04D29/62, F04D29/058, F04D29/054 | ||
Former IPC [2007/36] | F04D25/06, F04D29/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Title | German: | Motor-Kompressor | [2007/36] | English: | Motor compressor | [2007/36] | French: | Compresseur à moteur | [2007/36] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2009 | Observations by third parties | 28.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 06.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2007 | BG | 06.11.2013 | CY | 06.11.2013 | DK | 06.11.2013 | EE | 06.11.2013 | ES | 06.11.2013 | FI | 06.11.2013 | LT | 06.11.2013 | LV | 06.11.2013 | MC | 06.11.2013 | PL | 06.11.2013 | RO | 06.11.2013 | SE | 06.11.2013 | SI | 06.11.2013 | SK | 06.11.2013 | TR | 06.11.2013 | GR | 07.02.2014 | GB | 15.02.2014 | IE | 15.02.2014 | LU | 15.02.2014 | IS | 06.03.2014 | PT | 06.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.02.2007 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
GB | 15.02.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 06.11.2013 | |
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
GB | 15.02.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
GB | 15.02.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GB | 15.02.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | DK | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GB | 15.02.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | DK | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GB | 15.02.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | DK | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | DK | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | DK | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | EE | 06.11.2013 | |
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 06.11.2013 | |
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | ES | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | ES | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 06.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4969803 (TURANSKYJ LUBOMYR [DE]) [X] 1-3,8-10 * column 1, line 38 - line 40 * * column 1, line 53 - line 54 * * column 4, line 7 - line 18; figure 2; claim 1 * [I] 5; | [XY]US6464469 (GROB DENIS [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10 * column 3, line 18 - line 25 * * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 5; figure 2 * * column 6, line 38 - line 48 * * column 8, line 60 - line 64; figure 6 * [Y] 5,6; | [X]US2004179961 (PUGNET JEAN-MARC [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0026] ** paragraph [0030]; figure 2 *; | [XI]WO2005003512 (KVAERNER OILFIELD PROD AS [NO], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10 * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 34; figure 1; claims 1-2 * [I] 5; | [YA]EP1564379 (GOZDAWA RICHARD JULIUS [GB]) [Y] 5,6 * paragraph [0035]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0044]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0050]; figure 9b * [A] 1 | by applicant | US4969803 | US6464469 | WO2005003512 | other | EP0087197 | US4969803 | WO9429597 | WO9524563 | EP1074746 | WO2005124973 |