Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
15.07.2011 | Definitive list of designations | published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] |
08.07.2011 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.03.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.11.2010 | Publication of search report | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] |
16.07.2010 | Change - classification | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
09.03.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.03.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.05.2008 | Change - representative | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
18.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
27.07.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
27.07.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |