Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007194858 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20060054530 | 16.06.2006 | US70843107 | 21.02.2007 | US77531906 | 22.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20070085177 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20060054530 | 16.06.2006 | US77531906 | 22.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100813978B | Global Dossier | 17.03.2008 | B1 | KR20070085006 | 27.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20060054530 | 16.06.2006 | US77531906 | 22.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1827017 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2010 | A3 | EP1827017 | 29.08.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20060054530 | 16.06.2006 | US77531906 | 22.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101026720B | 29.09.2010 | B | CN101026720 | 29.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20060054530 | 16.06.2006 | US77531906 | 22.02.2006 |