EP1840036 - Packaging support and associated packaging method for pasta and other food products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Surgital S.p.A. Via Bastia, 16/1 48017 Conselice, Frazione Lavezzola (RA) / IT | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bacchini, Edoardo Via Donatello, 8 48017, LAVEZZOLA RA / IT | [2010/25] |
Former [2007/40] | 01 /
BACCHINI, Edoardo Via Donatello, 8 48017, LAVEZZOLA RA / IT | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07102776.7 | 21.02.2007 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | IT2006BO00136 | 24.02.2006 Original published format: IT BO20060136 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1840036 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1840036 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/36, B65D77/04 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
B65D1/36 (EP);
B65D77/0433 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Title | German: | Verpackungshilfe und zugehöriges Verpackungsverfahren für Nudeln und andere Lebensmittel | [2007/40] | English: | Packaging support and associated packaging method for pasta and other food products | [2007/40] | French: | Support d'emballage et procédé d'emballage correspondant pour pâtes ou autres produits alimentaires | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 29.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.06.2010 | CY | 23.06.2010 | CZ | 23.06.2010 | DK | 23.06.2010 | EE | 23.06.2010 | FI | 23.06.2010 | HU | 23.06.2010 | LT | 23.06.2010 | LV | 23.06.2010 | NL | 23.06.2010 | PL | 23.06.2010 | RO | 23.06.2010 | SE | 23.06.2010 | SI | 23.06.2010 | SK | 23.06.2010 | TR | 23.06.2010 | BG | 23.09.2010 | GR | 24.09.2010 | IS | 23.10.2010 | PT | 25.10.2010 | LU | 21.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
LU | 21.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
LU | 21.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
LU | 21.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1164487 (I S A P S P A [IT]) [X] 1-8 * figure -; claims 1,7 *; | [A]GB1172377 (CEASE CENTRAL INC [US]) [A] 1-8; | [X]GB1203349 (NEST PACK SPA [IT]) [X] 1-7,9-11 * page 1, lines 49-54 * * page 1, lines 82-93; figure - *; | [A]EP0677454 (KRAFT FOODS INC [US]); | [X]EP1219548 (EMBALLAGES KEYES SOC D [FR]) [X] 1-7,9-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1219548 |