EP1790226 - Fungicidal mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ammermann, Eberhard Von-Gagern-Str.2 64646, Heppenheim / DE | 02 /
Stierl, Reinhard Niao Song Shiang, No. 1-9, Dong Shan Road 83345, Kaohsiung County / TW | 03 /
Lorenz, Gisela Erlenweg 13 67434, Neustadt / DE | 04 /
Schöfl, Ulrich Erlenstr. 8 68782, Brühl / DE | 05 /
Strathmann, Siegfried Donnersbergstr.9 67117, Limburgerhof / DE | 06 /
Schelberger, Klaus Traminerweg 2 67161, Gönnheim / DE | 07 /
Christen, Thomas Im Brühl 58 67125, Dannstadt / DE | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/22] | 01 /
Ammermann, Eberhard Von-Gagern-Str.2 64646, Heppenheim / DE | ||
02 /
Stierl, Reinhard Niao Song Shiang, No. 1-9, Dong Shan R 83345, Kaohsiung County / TW | |||
03 /
Lorenz, Gisela Erlenweg 13 67434, Neustadt / DE | |||
04 /
Schöfl, Ulrich Erlenstr. 8 68782, Brühl / DE | |||
05 /
Strathmann, Siegfried Donnersbergstr.9 67117, Limburgerhof / DE | |||
06 /
Schelberger, Klaus Traminerweg 2 67161, Gönnheim / DE | |||
07 /
Christen, Thomas Im Brühl 58 67125, Dannstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 07102911.0 | 19.03.2003 | [2007/22] | Priority number, date | DE2002112704 | 21.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10212704 | [2007/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1790226 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1790226 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1790226 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/653, A01P3/00, // A01N43/32 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
A01N43/653 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/32 (KR);
A01N43/40 (KR)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/653, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/653, A01N37/46 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2007/22] | A01N43/653, A01P3/00, // A01N47/34, A01N47/26, A01N47/18, A01N43/78, A01N43/50, A01N43/42, A01N43/36, A01N43/32, A01N37/52, A01N37/46, A01N37/38, A01N35/06, A01N35/04, A01N33/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Extension states | LT | 05.03.2008 | LV | 05.03.2008 | Title | German: | Fungizide Mischungen | [2009/01] | English: | Fungicidal mixtures | [2007/22] | French: | Mélanges fongicides | [2007/22] |
Former [2007/22] | Fungizide mischungen | Examination procedure | 05.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 03.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03712051.6 / EP1489906 | Divisional application(s) | EP09157219.8 / EP2080433 | EP10180173.6 / EP2308300 | EP10180568.7 / EP2308301 | EP10180582.8 / EP2308302 | EP10180602.4 / EP2289326 | EP10181170.1 / EP2308303 | EP10181184.2 / EP2308304 | EP10181197.4 / EP2308305 | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.06.2009 | EE | 24.06.2009 | FI | 24.06.2009 | SI | 24.06.2009 | TR | 24.06.2009 | BG | 24.09.2009 | SE | 24.09.2009 | AT | 19.03.2010 | LU | 19.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
AT | 19.03.2010 | ||
LU | 19.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
AT | 19.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | EE | 24.06.2009 | |
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
AT | 19.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/17] | EE | 24.06.2009 | |
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | FI | 24.06.2009 | |
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO9616048 (BAYER AG [DE], et al); | [DA]WO9847367 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [DA] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9847370 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO0180641 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [A] * the whole document * |