EP1825978 - Tubular decorating means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECNO - ITALIA S.R.L. Via Marchesi, 13 41043 Formigine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states TECNO - ITALIA S.R.L. Via Marchesi, 13 41043 Formigine (MO) / IT | ||
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states Tecno-Europa S.r.l. Via Marchesi, 11 41043 Formigine / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fiandri, Giancarlo Via Nuova 2492/3 41048 Frignano sulla Secchia (MO) / IT | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | Brunacci, Marco, et al BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Pietro Giardini, 625 41125 Modena (MO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Brunacci, Marco, et al BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Scaglia Est, 19-31 41126 Modena / IT | ||
Former [2008/07] | Crugnola, Pietro, et al Luppi Crugnola & Partners S.r.l. Viale Corassori 54 41100 Modena / IT | ||
Former [2007/35] | Luppi, Luigi, et al Luppi Crugnola & Partners S.r.l. Viale Corassori 54 41100 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 07102934.2 | 23.02.2007 | [2007/35] | Priority number, date | IT2006MO00063 | 23.02.2006 Original published format: IT MO20060063 | [2007/35] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1825978 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1825978 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B28B11/04, B41F15/08, B41C1/18, B41N1/22, B41F27/00, B05C1/14, B41F17/00 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
B28B11/044 (EP);
B05C1/14 (EP);
B28B11/046 (EP);
B41C1/182 (EP);
B41F17/007 (EP);
B41P2217/56 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/35] | B28B11/04, B41F15/08, B41C1/18, B41N1/22, B41F27/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/35] | B28B11/04, B41F15/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/35] | Title | German: | Zylindrische Dekoriervorrichtung | [2007/35] | English: | Tubular decorating means | [2007/35] | French: | Dispositif cylindrique de décoration | [2007/35] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 08.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 10.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 10.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 10.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.06.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1040920 (GOMES TECHNOLOGY S P A [IT]) [Y] 11-15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0032]; figure - *; | [XYI]EP1468825 (TECNO EUROPA SRL [IT]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,16,17 * paragraphs [0037] - [0067]; figure - * [Y] 11-15 [I] 3-6; | [A]EP1535732 (TOSI S P A [IT]) [A] 1-17* paragraphs [0020] - [0040]; figure - *; | [E]EP1834768 (EURAM H R LTD [US]) [E] 1,2,6-10,16,17 * paragraphs [0025] - [0056] - [0 62] - [0065]; figure - * | Examination | US2007234914 | by applicant | EP1040920 | EP1468825 | EP1834768 |